Kidarium, LLC v. Kidville Franchise Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Kidarium, LLC
Defendant: Kidville Franchise Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10617
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Michael Garner on behalf of Kidarium, LLC. (Garner, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2019) (mro)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kidville Franchise Company, LLC. (pne)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
November 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidville Franchise Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kidarium, LLC. (Calihan, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calihan, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kidville Franchise Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18075237)Document filed by Kidarium, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Termination)(Calihan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidarium, LLC v. Kidville Franchise Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kidarium, LLC
Represented By: Robert Barnes Calihan
Represented By: William Michael Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidville Franchise Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?