Grimes v. Sony Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Grimes
Defendant: Julie Swidler, Sony Corporation, Sony Entertainment, Inc., Sony Corporation Of America and Wade Leak
Case Number: 1:2019cv10644
Filed: November 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 17 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaveri Banka Arora on behalf of Wade Leak, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation Of America, Sony Entertainment, Inc., Julie Swidler. (Arora, Kaveri)
January 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 18, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from David C. Rose dated December 31, 2019. Document filed by Wade Leak, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation Of America, Sony Entertainment, Inc., Julie Swidler.(Rose, David)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald S. Zakarin on behalf of Wade Leak, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation Of America, Sony Entertainment, Inc., Julie Swidler. (Zakarin, Donald)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Corey Rose on behalf of Wade Leak, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation Of America, Sony Entertainment, Inc., Julie Swidler. (Rose, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: February 13, 2020. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: February 20, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/20/2019) (ama)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul William Verner to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed in the 'To:' section of the summons PDF must directly correspond with the 'as to' party listed in the docket entry. List the party name first in the 'To:' section of the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wade Leak. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julie Swidler. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Corporation. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul William Verner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul William Verner to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Nature of Suit selected on the Civil Cover Sheet does not correspond with the Basis of Jurisdiction selected. No Courthouse Assignment was selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul William Verner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SONY Corporation, SONY CORP OF AMERICA, julie swidler. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
November 16, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Timothy Grimes.(Verner, Paul)
November 16, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Verner, Paul) Modified on 11/18/2019 (dnh).
November 16, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WADE LEAK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Grimes. (Verner, Paul)
November 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JULIE SWIDLER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Grimes. (Verner, Paul)
November 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SONY ENTERTAINMENT,INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Grimes. (Verner, Paul) Modified on 11/18/2019 (dnh).
November 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Grimes. (Verner, Paul) Modified on 11/18/2019 (dnh).
November 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SONY CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Timothy Grimes. (Verner, Paul)
November 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wade Leak, SONY CORP OF AMERICA, SONY Corporation, Sony Entertainment, Inc., julie swidler. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18079542)Document filed by Timothy Grimes.(Verner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Sony Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Swidler
Represented By: David Corey Rose
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Kaveri Banka Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: David Corey Rose
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Kaveri Banka Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: David Corey Rose
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Kaveri Banka Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation Of America
Represented By: David Corey Rose
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Kaveri Banka Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Leak
Represented By: David Corey Rose
Represented By: Donald S. Zakarin
Represented By: Kaveri Banka Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Grimes
Represented By: Paul William Verner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?