Buhannic v. Tradingscreen Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philippe Buhannic
Defendant: Frank Placenti, John Vassos, Bruce Rosenthal, Peter Neger, Jay Hoag, Piero Grandi, David Polak, Rick Kimball, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Stephen Radin and Robert Trudeau
Case Number: 1:2019cv10650
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ss
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter,, filed by David Polak, Piero Grandi, Stephen Radin, Frank Placenti, Pierre Schroeder, Jay Hoag, Tradingscreen Inc., Peter Neger, John Vassos, Rick Kimball, Robert Trudeau, Bruce Rosenthal. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are hereby directed to respond to Plaintiff's OTSC motion, Doc. 13, by January 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 1/27/2020) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/13/2020) (kv)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion To Dismiss with supporting papers served on Philippe Buhannic on January 6, 2020. Service was made by Mail and Federal Express. Document filed by Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos. (Buechner, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of John M. Vassos in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and motion for order imposing filing injunction.. Document filed by Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tradingscreen Letter to Philippe Buhannic dated October 18, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Tradingscreen Letter to Patrick and Philippe Buhannic dated October 24, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Founders Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Founders Agreement Amendment, #5 Exhibit E - Petition for Extraordinary Writ Mandamus dated December 23, 2019, #6 Exhibit F - Petition for Extraordinary Writ of Mandamus dated December 23, 2019, #7 Exhibit G - Petition for Extraordinary Writ of Mandamus dated December 13, 2019, #8 Exhibit H - Motion for Leave to File and Petition for Writ of Certiorari dated December 12, 2019, #9 Exhibit I - Buhannic Motion Papers, #10 Exhibit J - May 15, 2018 Transcript)(Vassos, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss and motion for order imposing filing injunction. . Document filed by Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos. (Vassos, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and motion for order imposing filing injunction. Document filed by Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos.(Vassos, John)
December 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evert John Christensen on behalf of Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Frank Placenti, Stephen Radin, Robert Trudeau. (Christensen, Evert)
December 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Alan Radin on behalf of Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Frank Placenti, Stephen Radin, Robert Trudeau. (Radin, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John M. Vassos dated December 20, 2019 re: Mr. Buhannic's application entitled "Notice of OTSC Motion To Request The Replacement of Judge Ramos By A Non-Interested, Efficient And Honest Judge That Cannot Be Manipulated By Corrupt Law Firms". Document filed by Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos.(Vassos, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF OTSC MOTION TO REQUEST THE REPLACEMENT OF JUDGE RAMOS BY A NON-INTERESTED, EFFICIENT & HONEST JUDGE THAT CANNOT BE MANIPULATED BY CORRUPT LAW FIRMS. Document filed by Philippe Buhannic.(sc)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John M. Vassos dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by Piero Grandi, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc. Defendants are granted leave to file a motions to dismiss with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due January 6, 2020; opposition due February 6, 2020 and reply due February 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/5/2019) (rjm)
December 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/6/2020. Responses due by 2/6/2020. Replies due by 2/20/2020. (rjm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy John Stephens on behalf of Peter Neger, David Polak, John Vassos. (Stephens, Timothy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Curtis Neger on behalf of Piero Grandi, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc.. (Neger, Peter)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Vassos on behalf of Piero Grandi, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc.. (Vassos, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tradingscreen Inc..(Vassos, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from John M. Vassos dated December 4, 2019. Document filed by Piero Grandi, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order signed by J. Ramos September 26, 2019 dismissing actions for lack of diversity jurisdiction)(Vassos, John)
November 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Paul G. Gardephe is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
November 21, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02915-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Philippe Buhannic to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Philippe Buhannic. (sac)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Philippe Buhannic consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Philippe Buhannic. (sac)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF OTSC MOTION re: #1 Complaint, to Stop the outright theft of my company by private equity crooks and corrup law firms. Document filed by Philippe Buhannic.(sac)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 465401248567) Document filed by Philippe Buhannic. (sac)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
November 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Piero Grandi, Jay Hoag, Rick Kimball, Peter Neger, Frank Placenti, David Polak, Stephen Radin, Bruce Rosenthal, Pierre Schroeder, Tradingscreen Inc., Robert Trudeau, John Vassos. (sac)
November 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buhannic v. Tradingscreen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Placenti
Represented By: Stephen Alan Radin
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vassos
Represented By: Timothy John Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Rosenthal
Represented By: John Michael Vassos
Represented By: Peter Curtis Neger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Neger
Represented By: Timothy John Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Hoag
Represented By: Stephen Alan Radin
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piero Grandi
Represented By: John Michael Vassos
Represented By: Peter Curtis Neger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Polak
Represented By: Timothy John Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Kimball
Represented By: Stephen Alan Radin
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Schroeder
Represented By: John Michael Vassos
Represented By: Peter Curtis Neger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradingscreen Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Vassos
Represented By: Peter Curtis Neger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Radin
Represented By: Stephen Alan Radin
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Trudeau
Represented By: Stephen Alan Radin
Represented By: Evert John Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philippe Buhannic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?