Pritt et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Pritt and Arnold Pritt
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation ind. and as suc. to Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crane Co., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv10651
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #22 MOTION for Mark A. Alonzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Mark A. Alonzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arnold Pritt, Ruth Ann Pritt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order PHV)(Alonzo, Mark) Modified on 1/13/2020 (wb).
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by CBS Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate GAMCO Investers Inc, Other Affiliate CBS Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation.(Tanenbaum, Michael)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by General Electric Company. (Vega, Dennis)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Geoffrey M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2019) (rro)
December 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18319798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18319798. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Davis, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Geoffrey)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) (va)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Joshua Wasserberg on behalf of Arnold Pritt, Ruth Ann Pritt. (Wasserberg, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 JOINDER to join CBS Corporation's Notice of Removal. Document filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories)(Howarth, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY for General Electric Company. Document filed by General Electric Company.(Okpewho, Afigo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 JOINDER to join re: #4 Notice of Removal,, . Document filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Okpewho, Afigo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Melody Kozin on behalf of Crane Co.. (Kozin, Nicole)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Oxamendi on behalf of Crane Co.. (Oxamendi, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crane Co..(Pehush, Tara)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Lynne Pehush on behalf of Crane Co.. (Pehush, Tara)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 JOINDER to join re: #4 Notice of Removal,, . Document filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 Friemoth Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 Sargent Affidavit Part 1 of 4, #5 Exhibit 4 Sargent Affidavit Part 2 of 4, #6 Exhibit 4 Sargent Affidavit Part 3 of 4, #7 Exhibit 4 Sargent Affidavit Part 4 of 4, #8 Exhibit 5 Forman Affidavit Part 1 of 2, #9 Exhibit 5 Forman Affidavit Part 2 of 2)(Pehush, Tara)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of CBS Corporation. (Vega, Dennis)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Tanenbaum on behalf of CBS Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation; CBS Corporation; General Electric Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
November 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York County. Case Number: 190259/2019..Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - 2nd Complaint filed 100819, #2 Ex B -1st Complaint filed 100819, #3 Ex C - Interrogatories, #4 Ex D - Foreman Affidavit Nov 23 2010, #5 Cert of Service of Removal, #6 Service List, #7 Notice of Notice of Removal to State Court, #8 Notice of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Okpewho, Afigo)
November 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF case caption must list all of the parties and may not contain 'et al'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/25/2019. (jgo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Okpewho, Afigo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate GAMCO Investors, Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation.(Okpewho, Afigo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York County. Case Number: 190259/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18083902).Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - 2nd Complaint filed 100819, #2 Ex B -1st Complaint filed 100819, #3 Ex C - Interrogatories, #4 Ex D - Forman Affidavit Nov 23 2010, #5 Cert of Service of Removal, #6 Service List, #7 Notice of Notice of Removal to State Court, #8 Notice of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Okpewho, Afigo) Modified on 11/19/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritt et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation ind. and as suc. to Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Lynne Pehush
Represented By: Nicole Melody Kozin
Represented By: David Oxamendi
Represented By: Geoffrey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Afigo Ifeoma Okpewho
Represented By: Michael Alan Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis Enrique Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Pritt
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Wasserberg
Represented By: Mark A Alonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Pritt
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Wasserberg
Represented By: Mark A Alonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?