Iotova et al v. Bharara et al
Plaintiff: Antoaneta Iotova and Isaak Almaleh
Defendant: Officer Jamie Brooks, Blanch Law Firm and U.S. Attorney Preet Bharara
Case Number: 1:2019cv10663
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Antoaneta Iotova, Isaak Almaleh were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
December 17, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #5 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Isaak Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(tp)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis On Appeal. Document filed by Isaak Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova.(tp)
November 22, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), with notice of right to appeal #2 Order of Dismissal, to Antoaneta Iotova 15570104 Federal Medical Center, Carswell P.O. Box 27137 Fort Worth, TX 76127 and to Isaak Almaleh 15569104 Metropolitan Detention Center P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (aea)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that pursuant to the February 28, 2018 order in United States v. Almaleh, et al., ECF 1:17-CR-0025, 108 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 28, 2018), the complaint is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/20/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs, and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs' complaint pursuant to Judge Forrests February 28, 2018 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/20/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
November 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Preet Bharara, Blanch Law Firm, Jamie Brooks. Document filed by Antoaneta Iotova, Isaak Almaleh.(rdz) Modified on 11/19/2019 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iotova et al v. Bharara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoaneta Iotova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaak Almaleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jamie Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanch Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Preet Bharara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?