Iotova et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Antoaneta Iotova and Issac Almaleh
Defendant: Ronald Wolfe and Associates, Blank and Rome LLP, Clarfield, Okon & Salomone, P.L., Altisource Online Auction, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., The Blanch Law Firm, Shapiro & Fishman LLP, Ocwen Financial Corporation and Florida Default Law Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv10664
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE RE: PENDING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. An appeal in the above-referenced case has been docketed in the Court of Appeals. According to the district court docket sheet or other available information, appellant has moved for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in district court on December 06, 2019 and that motion is pending. The appeal may not move forward until the motion is determined. Please direct the motion to the appropriate judge for determination. Upon the grant or denial of the motion, please enter the order and transmit it to the Court of Appeals. USCA Case No. 19-4158. (nd)
December 16, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-4158 from the U.S. Court of Appeals, 2nd Circ. assigned to #7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Issac Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova. (nd)
December 9, 2019 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Issac Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
December 9, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #7 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), #2 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Issac Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP, #2 4d Letter). (tp)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Document filed by Antoaneta Iotova.(tp)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from A. Iotova and I. Almaleh, dated 11/30/19 re: APPEAL OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL/ BRIEF OF APPEAL. Document filed by Issac Almaleh.(sc)
December 4, 2019 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Issac Almaleh ID No. 15569104 at Metropolitan Detention Center, P.O. Box 329002, Brooklyn, NY 11232 on 12/4/2019. (bwa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Issac Almaleh, re: Plaintiff I. Almaleh requests that the Court provide him with an updated docket sheet.Document filed by Issac Almaleh.(sc)
November 27, 2019 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #4 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from I. Almaleh received on 11/27/19. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that pursuant to the February 28, 2018 order in United States v. Almaleh, et al., ECF 1:17-CR-0025, 108 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 28, 2018), the complaint is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/21/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs, and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs' complaint pursuant to Judge Forrest's February 28, 2018 order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the action under this docket number. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/21/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm)
November 21, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order of Dismissal, #3 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), Notice of Appeal Forms, to Antoaneta Iotova ID No. 15570104 Federal Medical Center, Carswell P.O. Box 27137 Fort Worth, TX 76127 Issac Almaleh ID No. 15569104 Metropolitan Detention Center P.O. Box 329002 Brooklyn, NY 11232. (vba)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altisource Online Auction, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., Blank and Rome LLP, Clarfield, Okon & Salomone, P.L., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ronald Wolfe and Associates, Shapiro & Fishman LLP, The Blanch Law Firm. Document filed by Issac Almaleh, Antoaneta Iotova. (sac)
November 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iotova et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wolfe and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blank and Rome LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarfield, Okon & Salomone, P.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Online Auction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blanch Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Fishman LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Default Law Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoaneta Iotova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Almaleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?