Cosgrove v. Oregon Chai, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Cosgrove
Defendant: Oregon Chai, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10686
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Oregon Chai, Inc. waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Ryan Cosgrove. (Sheehan, Spencer)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) (rro)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oregon Chai, Inc.. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oregon Chai, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ryan Cosgrove. (Sheehan, Spencer)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheehan, Spencer)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oregon Chai, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18088305)Document filed by Ryan Cosgrove.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosgrove v. Oregon Chai, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Chai, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cosgrove
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?