Fleischer v. Barnard College et al
Petitioner: Georgette Fleischer
Respondent: Barnard College, Local 2110 of the United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers (UAW) and Ralph S. Berger
Case Number: 1:2019cv10738
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Georgette Fleischer 19 Cleveland Place Apt. 4A New York, NY 10012, at, on 12/30/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
December 30, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/30/2019 Re: Judge Ronnie Abrams #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Barnard College, Local 2110 of the United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers (UAW). (nb)
December 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barnard College, Local 2110 of the United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers (UAW). (nb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against Ralph S. Berger. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (iii). The Court denies Plaintiff's application for the Court to request pro bona counsel without prejudice to Plaintiff's filing another such application at a later date. (ECF 3.) The Clerk of Court is further directed to issue summonses for Barnard College and Local 2110 of the United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers, complete USM-285 forms with the service addresses for those defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on those defendants to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. ( USM-285 Form due by 1/29/2020., Request for Issuance of Summons due by 1/29/2020.), Ralph S. Berger (Arbitrator) terminated., Motions terminated: #3 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. filed by Georgette Fleischer. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/30/2019) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 20, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to Georgette Fleischer 19 Cleveland Place Apt. 4A New York, NY 10012. (aea)
December 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/19/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Georgette Fleischer. (sac)
November 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION. Document filed by Georgette Fleischer.(sac)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Georgette Fleischer.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleischer v. Barnard College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Georgette Fleischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barnard College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Local 2110 of the United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers (UAW)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph S. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?