Fonz, Inc. v. City Bakery Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fonz, Inc.
Defendant: The City Bakery, LLC, City Bakery Brands, LLC, Maury Rubin and Maurybakes, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10854
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Maury Rubin served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service was accepted by Maury Rubin. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Maurybakes, LLC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City Bakery Brands, LLC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The City Bakery, LLC served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maury Rubin. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maurybakes, LLC. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City Bakery, LLC. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Bakery Brands, LLC. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
November 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Albena Ilkova Petrakov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,125,833,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,126,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maury Rubin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maurybakes, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City Bakery, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City Bakery Brands, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fonz, Inc.. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Petrakov, Albena)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Bakery Brands, LLC, Maurybakes, LLC, Maury Rubin, The City Bakery, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18132775)Document filed by Fonz, Inc..(Petrakov, Albena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonz, Inc. v. City Bakery Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Bakery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Bakery Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurybakes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fonz, Inc.
Represented By: Albena Ilkova Petrakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?