Felder-Green v. Capital Management Services, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Shanequa Felder-Green
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Capital Management Services, L.P. and Northstar Location Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10859
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank of America, N.A. answer due 1/24/2020; Northstar Location Services, LLC answer due 1/24/2020. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND NORTHSTAR LOCATION SERVICES, LLC SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Park, Isaac)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Shan P. Massand dated January 14, 2020. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Massand, Shan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Capital Management Services, L.P. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service was accepted by Aurora Roldan. Document filed by Shanequa Felder-Green. (Kidd, Novlette)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Northstar Location Services, LLC answer due 1/21/2020. GRANTED. DEFENDANT NORTHSTAR LOCATION SERVICES, LLC SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Park, Isaac)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation. Document filed by Northstar Location Services, LLC.(Sanders, Paul)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Andrew Sanders on behalf of Northstar Location Services, LLC. (Sanders, Paul)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank of America, N.A. answer due 1/17/2020. GRANTED. DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Park, Isaac)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Shan P. Massand dated December 13, 2019. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Massand, Shan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., for Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Massand, Shan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Capital Management Services, L.P., Northstar Location Services, LLC. Document filed by Shanequa Felder-Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 10, 2019 Northstar Letter)(Kidd, Novlette)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint attaching Exhibit 1 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Novlette R. Kidd dated November 25, 2019. Document filed by Shanequa Felder-Green.(Kidd, Novlette)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America, N.A., Capital Management Services, L.P., Northstar Location Services, LLC. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Novlette Rosemarie Kidd. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (dnh)
November 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kidd, Novlette)
November 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Capital Management Services, L.P., Northstar Location Services, LLC and Bank of America, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shanequa Felder-Green. (Kidd, Novlette)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Capital Management Services, L.P., Northstar Location Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18134558)Document filed by Shanequa Felder-Green.(Kidd, Novlette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felder-Green v. Capital Management Services, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul Andrew Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanequa Felder-Green
Represented By: Novlette Rosemarie Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?