Galarza v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Wilson Galarza
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK, Carlos Aviles, Carlos Aquino, Stefano Priolo, Kevin Veloz, JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S), Police Officer Kevin Veloz, Sergeant Stefano Priolo, Police Officer Carlos Aviles, John/Jane Does Nos. 1-10 and Police Officer Carlos Aquino
Case Number: 1:2019cv10898
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331ef
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Carlos Aquino(Official capacity) answer due 3/2/2020; Carlos Aviles(Official capacity) answer due 3/2/2020; City of New York answer due 3/2/2020; Stefano Priolo(Official capacity) answer due 3/2/2020; Stefano Priolo(individually) answer due 3/2/2020; Kevin Veloz(individually) answer due 3/2/2020., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (rj)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED: Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to March 2, 2020. The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby rescheduled to Monday, March 23, 2020 at 11:45 a.m. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/17/2020) (rj)
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and request for adjournment of initial conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Susan Scharfstein dated January 16, 2020. Document filed by City of New York.(Scharfstein, Susan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Carlos Aviles served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Stefano Priolo(Official capacity) served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020; Stefano Priolo(individually) served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kevin Veloz(individually) served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Carlos Aviles(Official capacity) served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Carlos Aquino(Official capacity) served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Cheryl Grant, Co-Worker. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The Plaintiff is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendants and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/17/2019) (rro)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement); Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiringa Report and Recommendation), All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/17/2019) (jca)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service was accepted by Inez Contreras, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin Veloz. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stefano Priolo. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carlos Aviles(Official capacity). (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carlos Aquino. (dnh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (dnh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Veloz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stefano Priolo, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carlos Aviles, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carlos Aquino, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wilson Galarza. (Perry, Robert)
November 27, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Carlos Aquino, Carlos Aviles, Stefano Priolo, Kevin Veloz added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Wilson Galarza. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Perry, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
November 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Thomas Perry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York; Carlos Aquino; Carlos Aviles; Stefano Priolo; Kevin Veloz; John/Jane Does Nos. 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (sj)
November 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Thomas Perry re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Carlos Aquino, Carlos Aviles, Stefano Priolo, Kevin Veloz must be added again in their official capacity. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Perry, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Aquino, Carlos Aviles, CITY OF NEW YORK, JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S), Stefano Priolo, Kevin Veloz. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18149320)Document filed by Wilson Galarza.(Perry, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galarza v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Susan P. Scharfstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefano Priolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Veloz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Kevin Veloz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Stefano Priolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Carlos Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Carlos Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Galarza
Represented By: Robert Thomas Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?