Bombardier, Inc. v. Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bombardier, Inc.
Defendant: Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10906
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Failla's Individual Rules of Practice served on Horizon Air Industries, Inc. on December 30, 2019. Document filed by Bombardier, Inc.. (Fishman, Eric)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) (rro)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Horizon Air Industries, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. Service was accepted by Laura Crisp, Senior Paralegal. Document filed by Bombardier, Inc.. (Fishman, Eric)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (dnh)
November 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horizon Air Industries, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bombardier, Inc.. (Fishman, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bombardier, Inc..(Fishman, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fishman, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Air Industries, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18144712)Document filed by Bombardier, Inc..(Fishman, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bombardier, Inc. v. Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bombardier, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?