Beckwith et al v. New York City Transit Authority
Plaintiff: Patricia Tarrant, Audrey Charles, Wei Zhao, Patricia Beckwith, Joy A. Chacko and John Calhoun
Defendant: The New York City Transit Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv10930
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Wei Zhao, Audrey Charles, Patricia Beckwith, Joy A. Chacko, John Calhoun, Patricia Tarrant. (Doeschner, Daniel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The New York City Transit Authority served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. Service was accepted by Laverne Sterling, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Wei Zhao; Audrey Charles; Patricia Beckwith; Joy A. Chacko; John Calhoun; Patricia Tarrant. (Doeschner, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York City Transit Authority. (pc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to The New York City Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Beckwith, John Calhoun, Joy A. Chacko, Audrey Charles, Patricia Tarrant, Wei Zhao. (Doeschner, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/2/2019) (js)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York City Transit Authority. (sj)
November 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
November 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert J. Burzichelli re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Patricia Beckwith, John Calhoun, Joy A. Chacko, Audrey Charles, Patricia Tarrant, Wei Zhao must be added again on behalf of all others similarly situated. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The New York City Transit Authority, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patricia Beckwith, John Calhoun, Joy A. Chacko, Audrey Charles, Patricia Tarrant, Wei Zhao. (Doeschner, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Christian Doeschner on behalf of Patricia Beckwith, John Calhoun, Joy A. Chacko, Audrey Charles, Patricia Tarrant, Wei Zhao. (Doeschner, Daniel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burzichelli, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The New York City Transit Authority. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18151258)Document filed by Wei Zhao, Audrey Charles, Patricia Beckwith, Joy A. Chacko, John Calhoun, Patricia Tarrant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Consents)(Burzichelli, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckwith et al v. New York City Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tarrant
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Charles
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Zhao
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Beckwith
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy A. Chacko
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Calhoun
Represented By: Daniel Christian Doeschner
Represented By: Robert J. Burzichelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?