RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG v. PIB Consulting LLC
Plaintiff: RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG
Defendant: PIB Consulting and PIB Consulting LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10977
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Cannon, Ariel)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by December 6, 2019 as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/3/2019) (mro)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PIB Consulting LLC. (pc)
December 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ariel Purnell Cannon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PIB Consulting. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PIB Consulting LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG. (Cannon, Ariel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG.(Cannon, Ariel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cannon, Ariel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PIB Consulting. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18163704)Document filed by RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note)(Cannon, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG v. PIB Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RuVe Beratung & Treuhand AG
Represented By: Ariel Purnell Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIB Consulting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIB Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?