O'Connor v. Frank et al
Plaintiff: Michael O'Connor
Defendant: Emily Rosen and Phyllis Frank
Case Number: 1:2019cv11001
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Emily Rosen. Document filed by Phyllis Frank.(Dinnocenzo, Eric)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
December 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 FIRST MOTION for Anthony J. Borrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18347720. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST MOTION for Anthony J. Borrelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18347720. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Borrelli, Anthony)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Labinot Alexander Berlajolli on behalf of Michael O'Connor. (Berlajolli, Labinot)
December 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so redesignated. (wb)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06259-JPO. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Emily Rosen waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Emily Rosen. (Lewis, Cari)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-6259. Document filed by Michael O'Connor.(Ricker, Hunt)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ricker, Hunt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Michael O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit August 5 2019 Letter, #2 Exhibit August 12 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit August 19 2019 Email, #4 Exhibit September 11 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit September 24 2019 Email)(Ricker, Hunt)
December 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hunt S. Ricker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael O'Connor, Phyllis Frank, Emily Rosen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne)
December 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hunt S. Ricker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not properly signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
December 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hunt S. Ricker to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
December 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael P O'Connor.(Ricker, Hunt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ricker, Hunt) Modified on 12/2/2019 (pne).
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Phyllis Frank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18166264)Document filed by Michael P O'Connor. (Attachments: #1 Aug 5 2019 Letter, #2 Aug 12 2019 Letter, #3 Aug 19 2019 Email, #4 September 11 2019 Letter, #5 September 24 2019 Email, #6 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ricker, Hunt) Modified on 12/2/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Frank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Frank
Represented By: Eric John Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O'Connor
Represented By: Hunt S. Ricker
Represented By: Anthony Borrelli, Jr
Represented By: Labinot Alexander Berlajolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?