Alpha Capital Anstalt et al. v. Chilton Domestic Energy LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Alpha Capital Anstalt and Osher Capital Partners LLC
Defendant: Quest Energy Corporation, Thomas M Suave, Chilton Domestic Energy LLC and Mark C. Jensen
Case Number: 1:2019cv11005
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Eliezer Drew to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney; leave the date field blank to be completed by the court clerk. PDF text must be fully legible. Pleading should be re-filed as instructed before requesting summonses. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARK C. JENSEN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC. (Drew, Eliezer) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dnh).
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THOMAS M. SUAVE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC. (Drew, Eliezer) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dnh).
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to QUEST ENERGY CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC. (Drew, Eliezer) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dnh).
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHILTON DOMESTIC ENERGY LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC. (Drew, Eliezer) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dnh).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/18/2019) (rro)
December 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 4, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-18166664, paid on 11/27/2019. (pc)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Eliezer Drew. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Eliezer Drew. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eliezer Drew to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
December 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eliezer Drew. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC, Quest Energy Corporation, Chilton Domestic Energy LLC, Thomas M Suave, Mark Jensen, C. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC. Document filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt, Osher Capital Partners LLC.(Drew, Eliezer) Modified on 12/4/2019 (pc).
December 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eliezer Drew to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** Initial Pleading due by 12/9/2019. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpha Capital Anstalt et al. v. Chilton Domestic Energy LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha Capital Anstalt
Represented By: Eliezer Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osher Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Eliezer Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M Suave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton Domestic Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?