Butkovskaya v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nino Butkovskaya
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11014
Filed: November 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Nino Butkovskaya. Document filed by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CareCredit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Account Agreement GAP, #3 Exhibit Billing Statement Care Credit, #4 Exhibit Billing Statement GAP)(Beauchamp, Brenda)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement with Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2020) (cf)
January 9, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Pretrial Conference order, Judge's Individual Rules served on Equifax Information Services, LLC, American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Kohls Department Stores, Inc., Synchrony Bank on 1/9/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Mailing to American Express Co., #2 Proof of Mailing to Citibank, N.A., #3 Proof of Mailing to Equifax Information Services, LLC, #4 Proof of E-mail to Kohls and Synchrony)(Kroub, Edward)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. Application GRANTED. Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 29, 2020. (Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. answer due 1/29/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/8/20) (yv)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. American Express Co. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Jin Carlos DeGracia, Agent. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E. Brigandi on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Brigandi, John)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from John E. Brigandi, Esq. dated January 6, 2020. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Brigandi, John)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff and American Express, through their respective counsel, that: (1) all of Plaintiff's claims against American Express in this action shall be arbitrated pursuant to the written agreement to arbitrate between Plaintiff and American Express; and (2) all proceedings in this matter as to American Express, including any pending deadlines, are stayed pending completion of arbitration. (As further set forth in this Order.) Plaintiff and Defendant American Express Company shall file a status letter on February 14, 2020 and every 45 days thereafter to apprise the Court of the status of arbitration. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/26/2019) (cf)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by American Express Co.. (Garcia, Raymond)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Defendant Synchrony Bank shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by January 27, 2020. Synchrony Bank answer due 1/27/2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/23/2019) (mro)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brenda Beauchamp Ward dated December 20, 2019. Document filed by Synchrony Bank.(Beauchamp, Brenda)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Bank. Document filed by Synchrony Bank.(Beauchamp, Brenda)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brenda Beauchamp on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Beauchamp, Brenda)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service was accepted by Janell M. Bohn, Agent. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Synchrony Bank served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Service was accepted by Eva Willatt, Agent. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/9/2019) (cf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Citibank, N.A. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service was accepted by Karla Hein, Agent. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Synchrony Bank. (pne)
December 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
November 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Synchrony Bank, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya. (Kroub, Edward)
November 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kroub, Edward)
November 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Co., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Synchrony Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18169532)Document filed by Nino Butkovskaya.(Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butkovskaya v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Brenda Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Brigandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nino Butkovskaya
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?