Goat Fashion Limited v. 1661, Inc.
Plaintiff: GOAT FASHION LIMITED
Defendant: 1661, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11045
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/28/2020) (jca)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by 1661, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Peerce, Marjorie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Foot Locker, Inc., Other Affiliate Foot Locker Retail, Inc. for 1661, Inc.. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marjorie Joan Peerce to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (1661, Inc. answer due 1/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/9/2020) (jwh)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Marjorie J. Peerce dated January 9, 2019. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 1661, Inc..(Peerce, Marjorie) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb).
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marjorie Joan Peerce on behalf of 1661, Inc.. (Peerce, Marjorie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 1661, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service was accepted by Alana Wohlers, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Goat Fashion Limited. (Telesca, Thomas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Goat Fashion Limited.(Telesca, Thomas)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): wrong case number (case year) indicated on document. (ldi)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Telesca, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Telesca, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1661, Inc.. (pne)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Goat Fashion Limited. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
December 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thomas Anthoney Telesca. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
December 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED.(Telesca, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2019 (ldi).
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1661, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Telesca, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1661, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18184838)Document filed by GOAT FASHION LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Telesca, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goat Fashion Limited v. 1661, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOAT FASHION LIMITED
Represented By: Thomas Anthoney Telesca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1661, INC.
Represented By: Marjorie Joan Peerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?