Goldman v. Cox Radio, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Defendant: www.Easy93.com and Cox Radio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv11146
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 12/5/19 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (yv)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record during the conference held on November 6, 2019, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate these cases under the lead case, Docket No. 19-CV-2954, and to close 19-CV-11146 for administrative purposes. All future filings shall be on the 19-CV-2954 docket only. As discussed on the record, Defendants may file a single, consolidated answer to all of Plaintiff's complaints. All deadlines otherwise in force in 19-CV-2954 shall likewise apply to the cases to be consolidated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/5/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02954-JMF, 1:19-cv-11146-UA(yv)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-21947. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
December 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:19-cv-2954. (sjo)
December 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 5, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 5, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. (yv)
December 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02954-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSFER ORDER action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York #11 Motion Joint Motion to Open and Stipulation to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Open and Stipulation to Transfer Venue by Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Joshua B. Spector on behalf of Justin Goldman instead of prior counsel of record Robert Thornburg. . Attorney Joshua B. Spector added to party Justin Goldman(pty:pla). (Spector, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of the #8 Joint Motion to Stay. Either party may move to reopen at any time. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/19/2019. (jdo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Elise Fugate on behalf of Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party Cox Radio, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Elise Fugate added to party www.Easy93.com(pty:dft). (Fugate, Rachel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kenneth P. Norwick, mailing date May 15, 2019, (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (mailed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Cox Radio, Inc., www.Easy93.com. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11643931, filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Thornburg, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman v. Cox Radio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Represented By: Stephanie Vazquez
Represented By: Robert Houpt Thornburg
Represented By: Joshua B. Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.Easy93.com
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Elise Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?