R. G. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Amina Garner and R. G.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv11151
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #21 Letter Motion for extension of time to submit the parties' joint pretrial order. The instant request is, in essence, the request made in September 2021 that was rejected by the Court. Good cause for altering the schedule for submitting the parties' joint pretrial order has not been demonstrated. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
October 21, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint pretrial order addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from AUSA Allison Rovner dated October 21, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Rovner, Allison)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Letter Motion for extension of time to submit the parties' joint pretrial order. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint pretrial order addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from AUSA Allison Rovner dated September 17, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Rovner, Allison)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties shall, on or before September 30, 2021, submit to the court their joint pretrial order. That document must conform to the requirements for such an order that are found in the Individual Rules of Practice of the assigned district judge. SO ORDERED. Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 8/31/2021) (kv)
January 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox: Telephone Conference held on 1/26/2021. (Potter, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The schedule set forth in Docket Entry No. 16 is adopted by the Court and shall govern the parties' pretrial discovery activities. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Kirti Reddy dated January 26, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Reddy, Kirti)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to postpone conference. Telephone status conference set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox)(Text Only Order) (Fox, Kevin Nathaniel)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Kirti Reddy dated Jan. 11, 2021. Document filed by United States of America..(Reddy, Kirti)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Amina Garner, R. G. ENDORSEMENT: The above-noted schedule is adopted by the Court and will govern the parties' pretrial activities. A telephone status conference will be held with the parties on January 12, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall use call-in number (888) 557-8511 and access code 4862532. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 6/15/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Telephone Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/2/2020) (va)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Joshua Fogel dated August 20, 2020 re: Status Report. Document filed by R. G., Amina Garner..(Fogel, Joshua)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint status report to the Court on or before August 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/3/2020) (rj)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So Ordered. (United States of America answer due 3/5/2020.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/6/20) (yv)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/6/20) (yv)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Reddy, Kirti)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated March 5, 2020. Document filed by United States of America..(Reddy, Kirti)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of United States of America..(Reddy, Kirti)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. United States of America served on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by R. G.; Amina Garner. (Fogel, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (jgo)
December 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Fogel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: R. G.; Amina Garner; United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
December 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Fogel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10000000000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000;. (jgo)
December 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fogel, Joshua)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by R. G., Amina Garner. (Fogel, Joshua)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18218744)Document filed by R. G., Amina Garner.(Fogel, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. G. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amina Garner
Represented By: Joshua Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. G.
Represented By: Joshua Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kirti Vaidya Reddy
Represented By: Allison Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?