McDougal v. Fox News Network, LLC
Plaintiff: Karen McDougal
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11161
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Referring Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (DE-27). . Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC..(Regan, Shawn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (DE-27). . Document filed by Karen McDougal..(Bernstein, Eric)
February 14, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (DE-27). . Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC..(Regan, Shawn)
February 14, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (DE-27). Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC..(Regan, Shawn)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 28, 2020 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fox News Network, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Karen McDougal.(Bernstein, Eric)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Evelyn Blacklock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Andrew C. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Evelyn Blacklock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18522233. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Evelyn Blacklock, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - NY, #3 Proposed Order)(Blacklock, Evelyn)
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Andrew C. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18521998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew C. Lawrence, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - MD, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Evelyn Blacklock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18522233. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Andrew C. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18521998. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by February 3, 2020. Plaintiff will not be given any further opportunity to amend the complaint to address issues raised by the motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff does amend, by three (3) weeks after the amended complaint is filed, Defendant shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) file a letter on ECF stating that it relies on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If Defendant files an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. If Defendant files a new motion to dismiss, any opposition shall be filed within fourteen days, and any reply shall be filed within seven days of any opposition. If no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by February 3, 2020. Defendants reply, if any, shall be filed by February 10, 2020. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with one, double-sided courtesy hard copy of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Finally, it is further ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for February 11, 2020 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020, Responses due by 2/3/2020, Replies due by 2/10/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/14/2020) (jca)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Kathleen Ann Brogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Kenneth Winn Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Erin Elizabeth Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. . Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Regan, Shawn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Regan, Shawn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Kathleen Ann Brogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kathleen A. Brogan, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - MD, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Proposed Order)(Brogan, Kathleen)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Kenneth Winn Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487686. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of K. Winn Allen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - GA, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Proposed Order)(Allen, Kenneth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Erin Elizabeth Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erin E. Murphy, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - VA, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Erin)
January 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Kenneth Winn Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487686. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Erin Elizabeth Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487593. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Kathleen Ann Brogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18487765. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Shawn Patrick Regan dated December 19, 2019 re: briefly explaining the differences between the Amended Notice of Removal (ECF No.12) and the original Notice of Removal (ECF No.1).. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Regan, Shawn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Karen McDougal; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Verified Complaint)(Regan, Shawn)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference [Dkt. No. 6] served on Karen McDougal on December 17, 2019. Service was made by Federal Express overnight delivery. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Regan, Shawn)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for David Mitchell Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Elbert Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for David Mitchell Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18252065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Park in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-Court of Appeals, District of Columbia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Elbert Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18251848. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elbert Lin in Support of Motion for Admission pro hac vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- Supreme Court of Virginia, #3 Certificate of Good Standing-Supreme Court-Court of Appeals, District of Columbia, #4 Certificate of Good Standing-Supreme Court of Massachusetts, #5 Certificate of Good Standing-Supreme Court of West Virginia, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Elbert)
December 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Elbert Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18251848. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for David Mitchell Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18252065. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/6/2019) (va)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Ross Bernstein on behalf of Karen McDougal. (Bernstein, Eric)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Karen McDougal on December 5, 2019. Service was made by Mail and email. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Regan, Shawn)
December 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fox Corporation, Other Affiliate Fox Television Stations, LLC, Other Affiliate Fox Television Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Foxcorp Holdings LLC for Fox News Network, LLC. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC.(Regan, Shawn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Regan, Shawn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 161741/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18221601).Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Verified Complaint)(Regan, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougal v. Fox News Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Andrew Lawrence
Represented By: Evelyn Blacklock
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Represented By: Kathleen Brogan
Represented By: Elbert Lin
Represented By: David Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McDougal
Represented By: Eric Ross Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?