Acme Markets, Inc. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Acme Markets, Inc. and Albertsons Companies Inc.
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv11323
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by Acme Markets, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/24/2020) (jwh)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Alexander H. Gillespie dated 1/22/20 re: Defendant's motion to dismiss.. Document filed by Acme Markets, Inc..(Gillespie, Alexander)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Haffner Gillespie on behalf of Acme Markets, Inc.. (Gillespie, Alexander)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kohane, Dan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Dan D. Kohane, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Amended Decision & Order, #5 Exhibit D - Policy, #6 Exhibit E - Summons & Complaint)(Kohane, Dan)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/12/2019) (jwh)
December 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dan David Kohane. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State);. (pc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Kohane, Dan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Alexander H. Gillespie, Esq. on 12/11/2019. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kohane, Dan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kohane, Dan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68664/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18259689).Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Index, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint)(Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acme Markets, Inc. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acme Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Haffner Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertsons Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan David Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?