Princeton v. Entity ABC et al
Plaintiff: DARREN PRINCETON
Defendant: SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, Joseph A. Garcia, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, The City Of New York,, NYC Department of Homeless Services, Joslyn Carter, ENTITY ABC, New York City Department of Homeless Services, City Of New York, Commissioner Joslyn Carter, Commissioner Joseph A. Garcia, Kingsboro Men, Security Officers John Doe 1 - Doe 5 and Kingsboro Star Men
Case Number: 1:2019cv11438
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. City Of New York answer due 3/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/7/2020) (mro)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from MaryBeth Allen dated February 6, 2020. Document filed by City Of New York..(Allen, MaryBeth)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joslyn Carter, City Of New York, Employees John Doe 1 - John Doe 5, Entity ABC, Joseph A. Garcia, New York City Department of Homeless Services, New York City Department of Homeless Services Police, Security Officers John Doe 1 - Doe 5. (pc)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to ENTITY ABC a/k/a KINGSBORO STAR MEN'S SHELTER or KINGSBORO MEN'S SHELTER, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES, COMMISSIONER JOSLYN CARTER, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, COMMISSIONER JOSEPH A. GARCIA, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Darren Princeton. (Kaplan, David)
January 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Kaplan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Security Officers John Doe 1 - Doe 5. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Joslyn Carter, City Of New York, Employees John Doe 1 - John Doe 5, Entity ABC, Joseph A. Garcia, New York City Department of Homeless Services, New York City Department of Homeless Services Police, Security Officers John Doe 1 - John Doe 5 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darren Princeton. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Kaplan, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joslyn Carter, City Of New York, Employees John Doe 1 - John Doe 5, Entity ABC, Joseph A. Garcia, New York City Department of Homeless Services, New York City Department of Homeless Services Police, Security Officers John Doe 1 - John Doe 5. (dnh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENTITY ABC a/k/a KINGSBORO STAR MEN'S SHELTER or KINGSBORO MEN'S SHELTER, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES, COMMISSIONER JOSYLN CARTER, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, COMMISSIONER JOSEPH A. GARCIA, EMPLOYEE JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Darren Princeton. (Kaplan, David)
December 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David A. Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed in the as to docket entry and on the summons PDF must appear exactly as they do in the pleading caption. Do not use abbreviations in party names. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENTITY ABC a/k/a KINGSBORO STAR MEN'S SHELTER or KINGSBORO MEN'S SHELTER, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES, COMMISSIONER JOSLYN CARTER, NYC DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, COMMISSIONER JOSEPH A. GARCIA, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Darren Princeton. (Kaplan, David) Modified on 12/18/2019 (dnh).
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David A. Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF for the request for issuance of summons is not legible; document text must be clear. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaplan, David)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENTITY ABC a/k/a KINGSBORO STAR MEN'S SHELTER or KINGSBORO MEN'S SHELTER, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVCES, COMMISSIONER JOSLYN CARTER, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, COMMISSIONER JOSEPH GARCIA, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, and SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Darren Princeton. (Kaplan, David) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dnh).
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David A. Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; use 'et al' following the name of the first defendant if all party names do not fit in the space provided; if all party names do not fit in the 'To' field, write "see attached", and attach an addition page listing defendant name's and addresses; do not use abbreviations in party names. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David A. Kaplan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; use 'et al' following the name of the first defendant if all party names do not fit in the space provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David A. Kaplan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Employees John Doe 1 - John Doe 5, Entity ABC, New York City Department of Homeless Services Police, New York City Department of Homeless Services, Darren Princeton, Security Officers John Doe 1 - John Doe 5. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
December 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Kaplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square Suspense; Cause of Action code 28:1331; Nature of Suit code 360 (P.I.: Other); Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 440 (Civil Rights: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
December 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
December 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENTITY ABC a/k/a KINGSBORO STAR MEN'S SHELTER or KINGSBORO MEN'S SHELTER, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES, COMMISSIONER JOSLYN CARTER, NYC DHS POLICE, COMMISSIONER JOSEPH A. GARCIA, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, and SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by DARREN PRINCETON. (Kaplan, David) Modified on 12/16/2019 (pne).
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaplan, David) Modified on 12/16/2019 (pne).
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joslyn Carter, EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, ENTITY ABC, Joseph A. Garcia, NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE, NYC Department of Homeless Services, SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18277452)Document filed by DARREN PRINCETON.(Kaplan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton v. Entity ABC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITY OFFICERS JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMPLOYEES JOHN DOE 1 - JOHN DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOMELESS SERVICES POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City Of New York,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Homeless Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joslyn Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENTITY ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Homeless Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Represented By: MaryBeth Catherine Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Joslyn Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Joseph A. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsboro Men
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Officers John Doe 1 - Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsboro Star Men
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREN PRINCETON
Represented By: David A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?