Brown v. Montefiore Medical Center
Plaintiff: Kareem Brown
Defendant: Montefiore Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv11474
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference With Respect to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Emily Haigh dated February 12, 2020. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center..(Haigh, Emily)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Clara Haigh on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center..(Haigh, Emily)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Montefiore Medical Center waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. Document filed by Kareem Brown. (Gray, Stacey)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gray, Stacey)
December 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stacey M. Gray. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Stacey M. Gray to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected; multiple Basis of Jurisdiction code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gray, Stacey) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jgo).
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montefiore Medical Center. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18282903)Document filed by Kareem Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Errata, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit)(Gray, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Montefiore Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By: Emily Clara Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Brown
Represented By: Stacey M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?