Velasquez v. Two Big Boys, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Defendant: Two Big Boys, Inc. and John Iaonnou
Case Number: 1:2019cv11488
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. John Iaonnou served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. Service was accepted by JOHN IOANNOU. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Two Big Boys, Inc. served on 12/26/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouki, Authorize Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: March 18, 2020. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: March 25, 2020 at 4 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/18/2019) (ama)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/30/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/18/2019) (jca)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Two Big Boys, Inc.. (pc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Iaonnou. (pc)
December 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN IAONNOU, an individual, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TWO BIG BOYS, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weitz, Ben-Zion)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Iaonnou, Two Big Boys, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18287859)Document filed by Ricardo Velasquez.(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Two Big Boys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Velasquez
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Big Boys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Iaonnou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?