Mango v. Content IQ LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Mango
Defendant: Content IQ LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11519
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Content IQ LLC.(Bernstein, Hartley)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Content IQ LLC.(Bernstein, Hartley)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/18/2019) (jwh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Content IQ LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Document filed by Gregory Mango. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 18, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT AS PER INSTRUCTIONS FROM CHAMBERS ON 12/18/2019. Deleted document number #4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (va)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Content IQ LLC. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Content IQ LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregory Mango. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Content IQ LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18292835)Document filed by Gregory Mango. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mango v. Content IQ LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Mango
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Content IQ LLC
Represented By: Hartley T. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?