S v. The Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A S
Defendant: THE UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, INC., YACHAD: THE NATIONAL JEWISH COUNCIL FOR DISABILITIES and The Orthodox Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv11566
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer with Jury Demand served on Weinstein & Weinstein, LLP on January 16, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Union Of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc., Yachad: The National Jewish Council For Disabilities. (Rutherford, David)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The Union Of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc., Yachad: The National Jewish Council For Disabilities.(Rutherford, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Union Of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020; Yachad: The National Jewish Council For Disabilities served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. Service was accepted by Rachel Sims, In-House Counsel. Document filed by A S. (Weinstein, Jacob)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/19/2019) (jwh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Union Of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc., Yachad: The National Jewish Council For Disabilities. (sj)
December 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
December 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
December 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Zev Weinstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc.; Yachad: The National Jewish Council for Disabilities. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, INC. (A.K.A. THE ORTHODOX UNION); and YACHAD: THE NATIONAL JEWISH COUNCIL FOR DISABILITIES,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A S. (Weinstein, Jacob)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinstein, Jacob)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, INC., YACHAD: THE NATIONAL JEWISH COUNCIL FOR DISABILITIES. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18303512)Document filed by A S.(Weinstein, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S v. The Union of Orthodox Jewish Congregations of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A S
Represented By: Jacob Zev Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH CONGREGATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YACHAD: THE NATIONAL JEWISH COUNCIL FOR DISABILITIES
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Orthodox Union
Represented By: David Scott Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?