Gonzalez v. Naked Species, LLC
Plaintiff: Alberto Gonzalez
Defendant: Naked Species, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11571
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for Thursday, March 19, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Parties must attend in-person with their counsel. Corporate parties must send the person with decision making authority to settle the matter to the conference. The parties are instructed to complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with the Judge Parker's Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than March 12, 2020 by 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/4/20) (yv)
February 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephone Conference held on 2/3/2020. (ca)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Alberto Gonzalez..(Liebowitz, Richard)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tatyana Voloshchuk on behalf of Naked Species, LLC. (Voloshchuk, Tatyana)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, This case has been referred to me for settlement purposes (docket no. 7). A telephone conference will be held on Monday, February 3, 2020 at 4:45 p.m. in advance of a settlement conference. The parties are directed to review Judge Parker's Individual Practices at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Parker concerning settlement conferences in advance of the call. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. The Plaintiff is directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendant. Plaintiff is also instructed to file proof of this service with the Court. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 04:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/19/19) (yv)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Naked Species, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Document filed by Alberto Gonzalez. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2019) (cf)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To facilitate prompt settlement, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant(s), by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years; if the picture at issue has never been licensed, a further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2019) (cf)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Naked Species, LLC. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Naked Species, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alberto Gonzalez. (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Naked Species, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18305063)Document filed by Alberto Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Naked Species, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naked Species, LLC
Represented By: Tatyana Voloshchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?