OMG Accessories LLC v. Mystic Apparel LLC et al
Plaintiff: OMG ACCESSORIES LLC
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc. and Mystic Apparel LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11589
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference calendared for February 25, 2020 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Cameron S. Reuber dated February 14, 2020. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC..(Reuber, Cameron)
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Michael Adelman dated February 12, 2020 re: #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Cameron S. Reuber dated February 7, 2020. . Document filed by OMG Accessories LLC..(Adelman, Michael)
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Cameron S. Reuber dated February 7, 2020. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Reuber, Cameron)
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: DUE TO A SCHEDULING CONFLICT, THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled for 2/25/2020, shall take place at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (rsh)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. Counsel shall jointly complete and file Judge Lehrburger's [Proposed] Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which must be submitted in compliance with Judge Lehrburger's Individual Practices no later than one week before the initial case management conference. If suitable for the case, the parties are encouraged to use Judge Lehrburger's model Joint Electronic Discovery Submission and Proposed Order. These forms are available on the SDNY website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Lehrburger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/30/2020) (rsh)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/15/20) (yv)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC.(Reuber, Cameron)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores Inc.. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mystic Apparel LLC.(Reuber, Cameron)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Samuel Sloane on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC. (Sloane, Peter)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cameron Sean Reuber on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC. (Reuber, Cameron)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kohl's Department Stores Inc.. (pc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mystic Apparel LLC. (pc)
December 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Bardwell Adelman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael Bardwell Adelman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Adelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC. (Adelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mystic Apparel LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC. (Adelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC.(Adelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Adelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohl's Department Stores Inc., Mystic Apparel LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18311950)Document filed by OMG ACCESSORIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Infringing Item)(Adelman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OMG Accessories LLC v. Mystic Apparel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Represented By: Peter Samuel Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystic Apparel LLC
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Represented By: Peter Samuel Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMG ACCESSORIES LLC
Represented By: Michael Bardwell Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?