Make the Road New York et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Diana Doe, Brenda Doe, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Make the Road New York, Carl Doe, Eric Doe, Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe and African Services Committee
Defendant: Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of State and United States Department of Health & Human Services
Amicus Curiae: State of Hawaii, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, City of Chicago, City of Philadelphia, State of Oregon, STATE OF NEW YORK, State of Maine, City of New York, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island, State of Connecticut, State of Washington, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of New Jersey, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Colorado, City of Los Angeles, State of Illinois, State of Michigan, City of Oakland, State of New Mexico, County of Santa Clara, State of Nevada, District of Columbia and State of Minnesota
Case Number: 1:2019cv11633
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice of Motion to Dismiss). (Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Motion to Dismiss). Document filed by Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State..(Luh, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Notice of Motion to Dismiss).( Responses due by 2/27/2020) Document filed by Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State..(Luh, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Motion to Dismiss). Document filed by Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State..(Luh, James)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Upon consideration of amici the States of New York, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawai'i, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington, the District of Columbia, the County of Santa Clara, and the cities of New York, Chicago, Los Angeles, Oakland, Philadelphia, and Seattle's motion for leave to file anamici curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs, (ECF No. 49), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/10/20) (yv)
February 11, 2020 Filing 50 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from James C. Luh dated February 11, 2020 re: Department of State action concerning implementation of its October 2019 rule. Document filed by Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State..(Luh, James)
February 6, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Philadelphia, City of Seattle, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, County of Santa Clara, District of Columbia, STATE OF NEW YORK, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Amicus Brief).(Vale, Judith)
February 6, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Naomi Vale on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Washington, District of Columbia, County of Santa Clara, City of New York, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Philadelphia, City of Seattle..(Vale, Judith)
January 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Responses due by 2/13/2020, Replies due by 3/12/2020.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Oral Argument set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ama)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: terminating #46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response/Reply; terminating #46 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' consolidated brief comprising their memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and in support of Defendants' forthcoming motion to dismiss is due by February 13, 2020. Plaintiffs' consolidated brief comprising their reply in support of their motion for preliminary injunction and their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by February 27, 2020. Defendants' reply in support of their motion to dismiss is due by March 12, 2020. The page limit for each of Plaintiffs' and Defendants' briefs is extended to 50 pages. Oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be heard on March 17, 2020 at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/23/2020) (ama)
January 22, 2020 Filing 46 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from James C. Luh dated January 22, 2020., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from James C. Luh dated January 22, 2020. Document filed by Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State.(Luh, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ehrlich in Support re: #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #3 Exhibit 3 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #4 Exhibit 4 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #5 Exhibit 5 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #6 Exhibit 6 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #7 Exhibit 7 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #8 Exhibit 8 - Challenged Regulatory Action, #9 Exhibit 9 - Expert Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 - Expert Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 - Expert Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 - Expert Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 - Expert Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 - Plaintiff Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiff Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiff Declaration, #17 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiff Declaration, #18 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiff Declaration, #19 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiff Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20 - Plaintiff Declaration, #21 Exhibit 21 - Plaintiff Declaration, #22 Exhibit 22 - Plaintiff Declaration, #23 Exhibit 23 - Regulatory Action, #24 Exhibit 24 - Regulatory Action, #25 Exhibit 25 - Regulatory Action, #26 Exhibit 26 - Comment submitted to DHS, #27 Exhibit 27 - Regulatory Action, #28 Exhibit 28 - Regulatory Action, #29 Exhibit 29 - Regulatory Action, #30 Exhibit 30 - Regulatory Action, #31 Exhibit 31 - Regulatory Action, #32 Exhibit 32 - Regulatory Action, #33 Exhibit 33 - Comment submitted to DHS, #34 Exhibit 34 - Regulatory Action, #35 Exhibit 35 - Regulatory Action, #36 Exhibit 36 - Regulatory Action, #37 Exhibit 37 - Regulatory Action, #38 Exhibit 38 - Regulatory Action, #39 Exhibit 39 - Regulatory Action, #40 Exhibit 40 - Regulatory Action, #41 Exhibit 41 - Regulatory Action, #42 Exhibit 42 - Comment submitted to DHS, #43 Exhibit 43 - Academic Article, #44 Exhibit 44 - Estimated Impacts Report, #45 Exhibit 45 - Comment submitted to DHS, #46 Exhibit 46 - Comment submitted to DHS, #47 Exhibit 47 - News article, #48 Exhibit 48 - DHS tables, #49 Exhibit 49 - Draft Executive Order, #50 Exhibit 50 - Medicaid and CHIP report to Congress, #51 Exhibit 51 - Comment on DHS Rule, #52 Exhibit 52 - Comment on DHS Rule, #53 Exhibit 53-1 - Employer Health Benefits Survey, #54 Exhibit 53-2 - Employer Health Benefits Survey, #55 Exhibit 54 - Group Health Plan Eligibility, #56 Exhibit 55 - Comment on IFR, #57 Exhibit 56 - Administrative Record)(Ehrlich, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #39 Motion for Tanya Broder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/21/2020) (ama)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/21/2020) (va)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Nicholas Espiritu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/21/2020) (va)
January 21, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Tanya Broder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18538198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 17, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Tanya Broder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18538198. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Broder, Tanya)
January 15, 2020 Filing 38 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrew J. Ehrlich dated January 15, 2020. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Nicholas David Espiritu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18512815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
January 15, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Nicholas David Espiritu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18512815. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Espiritu, Nicholas)
January 14, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Luh on behalf of Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State. (Luh, James)
January 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 14, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07993-GBD. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to attend a conference at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures, and to furnish chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/13/20) (yv)
January 9, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittany Thomas on behalf of Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Thomas, Brittany)
December 30, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Health & Human Services served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alicia Doe; Central American Refugee Center New York; Brenda Doe; Diana Doe; African Services Committee ; Carl Doe; Make the Road New York; Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York); Eric Doe; Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Alex Azar served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alicia Doe; Central American Refugee Center New York; Brenda Doe; Diana Doe; African Services Committee ; Carl Doe; Make the Road New York; Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York); Eric Doe; Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Donald Trump served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alicia Doe; Central American Refugee Center New York; Brenda Doe; Diana Doe; African Services Committee ; Carl Doe; Make the Road New York; Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York); Eric Doe; Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of State served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alicia Doe; Central American Refugee Center New York; Brenda Doe; Diana Doe; African Services Committee ; Carl Doe; Make the Road New York; Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York); Eric Doe; Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Michael Pompeo served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Alicia Doe; Central American Refugee Center New York; Brenda Doe; Diana Doe; African Services Committee ; Carl Doe; Make the Road New York; Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York); Eric Doe; Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 26, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donald Trump. (pne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew James Ehrlich to RE-FILE Document No. #23 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Azar. (jgo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Elizabeth Welber on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Welber, Susan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Azar, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew) Modified on 12/23/2019 (jgo).
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Schwarz, Ghita)
December 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrew James Ehrlich to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names on summonses must exactly match what's listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Pompeo. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health & Human Services. (pc)
December 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Max Samuel Wolson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18332398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Max Samuel Wolson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18332398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit D.C. Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing)(Wolson, Max)
December 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 19cv7993. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Joan Cameron on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Cameron, Susan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lee Filburn on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Filburn, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Hurwitz, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Catholic Charities, Archdiocese of New York for Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York). Document filed by Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York).(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Central American Refugee Center New York.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by African Services Committee.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Make the Road New York.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex M. Azar, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2019 (pc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Pompeo, in his official capacity as United States Secretary of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-CV-7993. Document filed by African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York.(Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram on behalf of African Services Committee, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc., Central American Refugee Center New York, Alicia Doe, Brenda Doe, Carl Doe, Diana Doe, Eric Doe, Make the Road New York. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Azar, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18322003)Document filed by Alicia Doe, Central American Refugee Center New York, Brenda Doe, Diana Doe, African Services Committee, Carl Doe, Make the Road New York, Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York), Eric Doe, Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc..(Ehrlich, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Make the Road New York et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pompeo
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: James Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Charities Community Services (Archdiocese of New York)
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Doe
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Doe
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Doe
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Doe
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central American Refugee Center New York
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Doe
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: African Services Committee
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Represented By: Christopher Lee Filburn
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Susan Joan Cameron
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Max Wolson
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Welber
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Chicago
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Philadelphia
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oregon
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maine
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of New York
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Delaware
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Vermont
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Washington
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Seattle
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Colorado
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Illinois
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Michigan
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Oakland
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nevada
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: District of Columbia
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Judith Naomi Vale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?