Hagerty v. Liberty Property Trust et al
Plaintiff: Royal Hagerty
Defendant: Katherine Dietze, Daniel P. Garton, Fredric J. Tomczyk, Lawrence D. Raiman, David L. Lingerfelt, Robert G. Gifford, Thomas C. Deloach Jr., Liberty Property Trust, Antonio Fernandez, William P. Hankowsky and Marguerite Nader
Case Number: 1:2019cv11679
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Daniel P. Garton waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David L. Lingerfelt waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fredric J. Tomczyk waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Katherine Dietze waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lawrence D. Raiman waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Liberty Property Trust waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marguerite Nader waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert G. Gifford waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Thomas C. Deloach Jr. waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William P. Hankowsky waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Antonio Fernandez waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Royal Hagerty. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas C. Deloach Jr., Katherine Dietze, Antonio Fernandez, Daniel P. Garton, Robert G. Gifford, William P. Hankowsky, Liberty Property Trust, David L. Lingerfelt, Marguerite Nader, Lawrence D. Raiman, Fredric J. Tomczyk. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18331576)Document filed by Royal Hagerty.(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagerty v. Liberty Property Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Dietze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P. Garton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredric J. Tomczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence D. Raiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Lingerfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Deloach Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Property Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Hankowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marguerite Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Hagerty
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?