Solis et al v. 53rd Street Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Cortes Zamora, Nestor Omar Cespedes, Pablo Solis, Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia, Yullios Donge Meneses, Cesar Ruiz, Amelia Mejia Escobar, Aridon Ymeri, Rachel Lovaglio Canal, Manuel Molina, Marcelo Vargas, Heriberto Martinez, Ricardo Herrera, Gabriel Cabrera Platero, Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate, Armando Ramirez, Julio Vega, Carlos Colmena, Julian Galindo, Ruhul Amin Tipu, Adrian Gil, Claudia Lodi Freddi, Paulino Carpintero, Andres Taveras, Erick Cortes Zamora, Jayanta Dey, Osvaldo Serrato, Carlos Perez, Abraham Fonseca, Gabriel Ruiz, Luis Perez, Nubia Liliana Velandia, Wandy Mayobanex Richiez, Snizhana Romaniuk, Dilio Urgiles, Walter Calle, Filip Kozminski, Jose Figueroa, Esdras Obed Paz Quezada, Xavier Ortiz, Karen Marin, Oscar Velandia, Bairma Gyndunova and Mariana Iturbide Orozco
Defendant: Roberto Delledonne, 53rd Street Partners, LLC and Stefano Frittella
Case Number: 1:2019cv11708
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 56 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nubia Liliana Velandia.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 29, 2020 Filing 55 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Gabriel Ruiz.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 29, 2020 Filing 54 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Luis Perez.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 29, 2020 Filing 53 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Abraham Fonseca.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 21, 2020 Filing 52 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Wandy Mayobanex Richiez.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 21, 2020 Filing 51 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Carlos Perez.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 17, 2020 Filing 50 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Osvaldo Serrato.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 17, 2020 Filing 49 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jose Figueroa.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 13, 2020 Filing 48 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 53rd Street Partners, LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Armando Ramirez; Jayanta Dey; Marcelo Vargas; Nestor Omar Cespedes; Andres Taveras; Pablo Solis; Filip Kozminski; Gabriel Cabrera Platero; Dilio Urgiles; Oscar Velandia; Carlos Colmena; Aridon Ymeri; Amelia Mejia Escobar; Rachel Lovaglio Canal; Bairma Gyndunova; Ruhul Amin Tipu; Snizhana Romaniuk; Esdras Obed Paz Quezada; Karen Marin; Walter Calle; Heriberto Martinez; Paulino Carpintero; Yullios Donge Meneses; Julio Vega; Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate; Claudia Lodi Freddi; Cesar Ruiz; Adrian Gil; Ricardo Cortes Zamora; Erick Cortes Zamora; Ricardo Herrera; Mariana Iturbide Orozco; Manuel Molina; Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia; Xavier Ortiz; Julian Galindo. (Consiglio, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Roberto Delledonne served on 1/4/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. Service was accepted by Janine Delledonne. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Armando Ramirez; Jayanta Dey; Marcelo Vargas; Nestor Omar Cespedes; Andres Taveras; Pablo Solis; Filip Kozminski; Gabriel Cabrera Platero; Dilio Urgiles; Oscar Velandia; Carlos Colmena; Aridon Ymeri; Amelia Mejia Escobar; Rachel Lovaglio Canal; Bairma Gyndunova; Ruhul Amin Tipu; Snizhana Romaniuk; Esdras Obed Paz Quezada; Karen Marin; Walter Calle; Heriberto Martinez; Paulino Carpintero; Yullios Donge Meneses; Julio Vega; Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate; Claudia Lodi Freddi; Cesar Ruiz; Adrian Gil; Ricardo Cortes Zamora; Erick Cortes Zamora; Ricardo Herrera; Mariana Iturbide Orozco; Manuel Molina; Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia; Xavier Ortiz; Julian Galindo. (Consiglio, Anthony)
January 9, 2020 Filing 46 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Dilio Urgiles.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 9, 2020 Filing 45 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Esdras Obed Paz Quezada.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 7, 2020 Filing 44 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Xavier Ortiz.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 6, 2020 Filing 43 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Walter Calle.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 3, 2020 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stefano Frittella. (dnh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roberto Delledonne. (dnh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 53rd Street Partners, LLC. (dnh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stefano Frittella, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruhul Amin Tipu, Gabriel Cabrera Platero, Rachel Lovaglio Canal, Paulino Carpintero, Carlos Colmena, Erick Cortes Zamora, Ricardo Cortes Zamora, Jayanta Dey, Yullios Donge Meneses, Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia, Claudia Lodi Freddi, Julian Galindo, Adrian Gil, Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate, Bairma Gyndunova, Ricardo Herrera, Mariana Iturbide Orozco, Filip Kozminski, Karen Marin, Heriberto Martinez, Amelia Mejia Escobar, Manuel Molina, Nestor Omar Cespedes, Armando Ramirez, Snizhana Romaniuk, Cesar Ruiz, Pablo Solis, Andres Taveras, Marcelo Vargas, Julio Vega, Oscar Velandia, Aridon Ymeri. (Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roberto Delledonne, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruhul Amin Tipu, Gabriel Cabrera Platero, Rachel Lovaglio Canal, Paulino Carpintero, Carlos Colmena, Erick Cortes Zamora, Ricardo Cortes Zamora, Jayanta Dey, Yullios Donge Meneses, Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia, Claudia Lodi Freddi, Julian Galindo, Adrian Gil, Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate, Bairma Gyndunova, Ricardo Herrera, Mariana Iturbide Orozco, Filip Kozminski, Karen Marin, Heriberto Martinez, Amelia Mejia Escobar, Manuel Molina, Nestor Omar Cespedes, Armando Ramirez, Snizhana Romaniuk, Cesar Ruiz, Pablo Solis, Andres Taveras, Marcelo Vargas, Julio Vega, Oscar Velandia, Aridon Ymeri. (Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 53rd Street Partners LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ruhul Amin Tipu, Gabriel Cabrera Platero, Rachel Lovaglio Canal, Paulino Carpintero, Carlos Colmena, Erick Cortes Zamora, Ricardo Cortes Zamora, Jayanta Dey, Yullios Donge Meneses, Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia, Claudia Lodi Freddi, Julian Galindo, Adrian Gil, Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate, Bairma Gyndunova, Ricardo Herrera, Mariana Iturbide Orozco, Filip Kozminski, Karen Marin, Heriberto Martinez, Amelia Mejia Escobar, Manuel Molina, Nestor Omar Cespedes, Armando Ramirez, Snizhana Romaniuk, Cesar Ruiz, Pablo Solis, Andres Taveras, Marcelo Vargas, Julio Vega, Oscar Velandia, Aridon Ymeri. (Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Snizhana Romaniuk.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Oscar Velandia.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 34 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Karen Marin.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 33 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Filip Kozminski.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 32 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mariana Iturbide Orozco.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 31 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Bairma Gyndunova.(Consiglio, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/30/2019) (rjm)
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Patrick Consiglio. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Nature of Suit code 710 (Labor: Fair Standards); Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201fl; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 442 (Civil Rights: Jobs); the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged);. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Aridon Ymeri.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Julio Vega.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Marcelo Vargas.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Andres Taveras.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Pablo Solis.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Cesar Ruiz.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Armando Ramirez.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Manuel Molina.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Amelia Mejia Escobar.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Heriberto Martinez.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rachel Lovaglio Canal.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jayanta Dey.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ricardo Herrera.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Adrian Gil.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Julian Galindo.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Claudia Lodi Freddi.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #30 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff under the FLSA) - CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate.(Consiglio, Anthony) Modified on 1/6/2020 (db).
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Yullios Donge Meneses.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ricardo Cortes Zamora.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Erick Cortes Zamora.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Carlos Colmena.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nestor Omar Cespedes.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Paulino Carpintero.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Gabriel Cabrera Platero.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ruhul Amin Tipu.(Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Consiglio, Anthony)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 53rd Street Partners, LLC, Roberto Delledonne, Stefano Frittella. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18336628)Document filed by Pablo Solis, Andres Taveras.(Consiglio, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis et al v. 53rd Street Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Cortes Zamora
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Omar Cespedes
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Solis
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Mauricio Fajardo Plasencia
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yullios Donge Meneses
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Ruiz
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Mejia Escobar
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aridon Ymeri
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lovaglio Canal
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Molina
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Vargas
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Martinez
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Herrera
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Cabrera Platero
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Fernando Gomez Alzate
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Ramirez
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Vega
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Colmena
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Galindo
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruhul Amin Tipu
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Gil
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Lodi Freddi
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino Carpintero
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Taveras
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Cortes Zamora
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayanta Dey
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Serrato
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Perez
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Fonseca
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ruiz
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Perez
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nubia Liliana Velandia
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wandy Mayobanex Richiez
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snizhana Romaniuk
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilio Urgiles
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Calle
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filip Kozminski
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Figueroa
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esdras Obed Paz Quezada
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Ortiz
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Marin
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Velandia
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bairma Gyndunova
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Iturbide Orozco
Represented By: Anthony Patrick Consiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Delledonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 53rd Street Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefano Frittella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?