Sacaquirin v. New York City Criminal Justice Agency et al
Plaintiff: George Sacaquirin
Defendant: Crystal Cotton, Efrain Mejia, New York City Criminal Justice Agency, Jian Yong Moy, Andrew Cox, Ruth Gerena and Christina Amaro
Case Number: 1:2019cv11713
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Christina Amaro (In Her Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Christina Amaro (In Her Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Crystal Cotton (In Her Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Crystal Cotton (In Her Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Andrew Cox (In His Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Andrew Cox (In His Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Ruth Gerena (In Her Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Ruth Gerena (In Her Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Efrain Mejia (In His Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Jian Yong Moy (In Her Official Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; Jian Yong Moy (In Her Individual Capacity) answer due 3/13/2020; New York City Criminal Justice Agency answer due 3/13/2020. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/12/2020) (kv)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - on consent - addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Anthony J. Tomari dated 2/11/2020. Document filed by Christina Amaro( In Her Individual Capacity), Christina Amaro( In Her Official Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Individual Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Official Capacity), Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity), Efrain Mejia( In His Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Individual Capacity), New York City Criminal Justice Agency..(Tomari, Anthony)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony John Tomari on behalf of Christina Amaro( In Her Individual Capacity), Christina Amaro( In Her Official Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Individual Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Official Capacity), Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity), Efrain Mejia( In His Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Individual Capacity), New York City Criminal Justice Agency..(Tomari, Anthony)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christina Amaro( In Her Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Crystal Cotton( In Her Individual Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Crystal Cotton( In Her Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Andrew Cox( In His Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Andrew Cox( In His Individual Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Ruth Gerena( In Her Individual Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Ruth Gerena( In Her Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Efrain Mejia( In His Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Jian Yong Moy( In Her Official Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; Jian Yong Moy( In Her Individual Capacity) served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020; New York City Criminal Justice Agency served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. Service was accepted by SEAN SULLIVAN, CO-WORKER. Document filed by George Sacaquirin. (Phillips, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yusha D Hiraman on behalf of George Sacaquirin. (Hiraman, Yusha)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christina Amaro( In Her Individual Capacity), Christina Amaro( In Her Official Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Individual Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Official Capacity), Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity), Efrain Mejia( In His Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Individual Capacity), New York City Criminal Justice Agency. (pc)
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Criminal Justice Agency, Efrain Mejia, Andrew Cox, Crystal Cotton, Christina Amaro, Ruth Gerena, and Jian Yong Moy, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by George Sacaquirin. (Calliste, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calliste, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christina Amaro( In Her Individual Capacity), Christina Amaro( In Her Official Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Individual Capacity), Crystal Cotton( In Her Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Official Capacity), Andrew Cox( In His Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Individual Capacity), Ruth Gerena( In Her Official Capacity), Efrain Mejia(In His Individual Capacity), Efrain Mejia( In His Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Official Capacity), Jian Yong Moy( In Her Individual Capacity), New York City Criminal Justice Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18337565)Document filed by George Sacaquirin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to NYCCHR and NYC Law Department)(Calliste, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacaquirin v. New York City Criminal Justice Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Cotton
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Mejia
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Criminal Justice Agency
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Yong Moy
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cox
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Gerena
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Amaro
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Sacaquirin
Represented By: Gregory Calliste, Jr
Represented By: Yusha D Hiraman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?