Chen et al v. Dun Huang Corp et al
Plaintiff: Jinxiong Chen, Jason Chen and Chan Yin Lau
Defendant: Dun Huang Newland Corp, Zhongqi Bian, Yang Liu, Dun Huang Corp, Siwen Liu, John Doe Corp, New York Dun Huang Inc, Haijun Lu, Hong Ji, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, DH Newland Corp and Shiyang Li
Case Number: 1:2019cv11883
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau..(Schweitzer, Aaron)
February 20, 2020 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007.(ah)
February 11, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leanghour Lim on behalf of Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau..(Lim, Leanghour)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Defendants' response to the complaint is due by March 3, 2020. So ordered. re: #1 Complaint filed by Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau. Zhongqi Bian answer due 3/3/2020; New York Dun Huang Inc answer due 3/3/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/5/2020) (rjm)
January 31, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John Troy dated January 31, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' Letter to Clarify the Answer Due Date. Document filed by Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau..(Troy, John)
January 29, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Ge Qu dated 01/29/2020 re: Waivers of Service. Document filed by Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Qu, Ge)
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John Troy dated 01/29/2020 re: Clarify Defendants' Answer Due Date. Document filed by Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau.(Troy, John)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/27/2020.(mf)
January 16, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau, Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe", Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. John Doe Corp served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe", Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York Dun Huang Inc served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe", Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dun Huang Newland Corp served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe", Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dun Huang Corp served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Haijun Lu served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Yang Liu served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Siwen Liu served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hong Ji served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Zhongqi Bian served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe", Manager. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Shiyang Li served on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Andy "Doe" / Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau; Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POS as to Andy "Doe, Manager of Dun Huang)(Troy, John)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jian Hang on behalf of Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. (Hang, Jian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Hong Ji waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Dun Huang Corp waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; John Doe Corp waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Shiyang Li waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Siwen Liu waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Haijun Lu waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Dun Huang Newland Corp waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; DH Newland Corp waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Yang Liu waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Zhongqi Bian waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; New York Dun Huang Inc waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Document filed by Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc ; Hong Ji; Dun Huang Corp ; John Doe Corp ; Shiyang Li; Siwen Liu; Haijun Lu; Dun Huang Newland Corp ; DH Newland Corp ; Yang Liu; Zhongqi Bian; New York Dun Huang Inc. (Qu, Ge)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/23/2020. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2019) (mf)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/3/2020) (jwh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ge Qu on behalf of Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. (Qu, Ge)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jinxiong Chen; Dun Huang Corp ; DH Newland Corp; New York Dun Huang Inc; Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc; John Doe Corp; Dun Huang Newland Corp. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
December 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Troy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code y (Yes);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted;. (jgo)
December 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Troy on behalf of Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau. (Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DUN HUANG CORP d/b/a Dun Huang; DH NEWLAND CORP d/b/a Dun Huang; NEW YORK DUN HUANG INC d/b/a Dun Huang; LANZHOU BEEF NOODLE INC d/b/a Dun Huang; JOHN DOE CORP d/b/a Dun Huang; and DUN HUANG NEWLAND CORP d/b/a Dung Huang and d/b/a Miss Noodle; SHIYANG LI, ZHONGQI BIAN, HONG JI, SIWEN LIU, YANG LIU, and HAIJUN LU, re: #2 Complaint,,. Document filed by Jinxiong Chen, Chan Yin Lau. (Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau.(Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jinxiong Chen.(Troy, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. Document filed by Chan Yin Lau, Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited, #7 Exhibit 07 Dun Huang Website)(Troy, John) Modified on 12/30/2019 (jgo).
December 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zhongqi Bian, DH Newland Corp, Dun Huang Corp, Dun Huang Newland Corp, Hong Ji, John Doe Corp, Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc, Shiyang Li, Siwen Liu, Yang Liu, Haijun Lu, New York Dun Huang Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18380528)Document filed by Chan Yin Lau, Jinxiong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited, #7 Exhibit 07 Dun Huang Website)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen et al v. Dun Huang Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinxiong Chen
Represented By: John Troy
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Chen
Represented By: John Troy
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chan Yin Lau
Represented By: John Troy
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dun Huang Newland Corp
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhongqi Bian
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Liu
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dun Huang Corp
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siwen Liu
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corp
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Dun Huang Inc
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haijun Lu
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Ji
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanzhou Beef Noodle Inc
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Newland Corp
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiyang Li
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?