Chen v. Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc et al
Plaintiff: Guangfu Chen and Guangcheng Chen
Defendant: Yi Chang Chen, J & J Asian Bistro Inc, Mei Fong Chan, Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc and Gary Chen
Case Number: 1:2019cv11895
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mei Fong Chan, Yi Chang Chen, J & J Asian Bistro Inc, Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc. (dnh)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MATSU FUSION RESTAURANT INC. d/b/a Matsu Japanese Fusion; and J & J ASIAN BISTRO INC. d/b/a Matsu Japanese Fusion; YI CHANG CHEN a/k/a Gary Chen, and MEI FONG CHAN, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Guangcheng Chen. (Troy, John)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for April 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/2/20) (yv)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA"), 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, no later than one week after an answer is filed, the parties shall contact the Chambers of the assigned Magistrate Judge to schedule a settlement conference to take place at least two weeks before the initial pretrial conference scheduled below. Further, to facilitate those settlement discussions, the parties shall, no later than three weeks after an answer is filed, exchange limited discovery in aid of settlement; the parties shall confer with respect to the scope of such limited discovery, and promptly raise any disputes with the assigned Magistrate Judge in accordance with his or her Individual Rules and Practices. it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 22, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/2/20) (yv)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney John Troy. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Guangcheng Chen. Duplicate party was added to the case in error. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption on civil cover sheet does not match pleading caption; plaintiff name is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Troy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption on summons request PDF does not match pleading caption; plaintiff name is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Guangfu Chen was changed to Guangcheng Chen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney John Troy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc, Yi Chang Chen, J & J Asian Bistro Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leanghour Lim on behalf of Guangfu Chen. (Lim, Leanghour)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Guangfu Chen. (Schweitzer, Aaron)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MATSU FUSION RESTAURANT INC. d/b/a Matsu Japanese Fusion; and J & J ASIAN BISTRO INC. d/b/a Matsu Japanese Fusion; YI CHANG CHEN a/k/a Gary Chen, and MEI FONG CHAN, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Guangfu Chen. (Troy, John) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Troy, John) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pne).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc, Guangfu Chen, Mei Fong Chan, J & J Asian Bistro Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18388394)Document filed by Guangfu Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Notice to Enforce Shareholder Liability for Services Rendered, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice to Inspect Share Records, #3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment, #5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and NYLL, #6 Exhibit 06 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guangfu Chen
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guangcheng Chen
Represented By: Leanghour Lim
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Chang Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Asian Bistro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mei Fong Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsu Fusion Restaurant Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?