Dukes v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer C. Dukes and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv11922
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Overdue Discovery Pursuant to Order No. 25. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al..(Bloomer, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered L&E's remaining arguments and finds them to be without merit. Accordingly, L&E's motion is DENIED, without prejudice to renewal after resolution of the Pending Motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (jca)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: On February 6, 2020, Langdon & Emison filed a notice of appeal from the Court's Order of November 8, 2019. See ECF No. 7712. If any party believes the notice of appeal moots or otherwise has bearing on the pending motion for certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), see ECF No. 7683, it shall advise the Court by letter no later than February 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/7/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Any party that objects to the motion for certification and entry of a final judgment filed by Langdon & Emison LLC, 14-MD-2543, ECF No. 7683, shall file a letter advising the Court of the intent to file an opposition no later than January 24, 2020. The formal opposition itself shall be filed no later than February 4, 2020. Any reply shall be filed no later than February 11, 2020. If no party files a letter by January 24, 2020, the Court will treat the motion as unopposed. Langdon & Emison incorrectly filed its motion in every single member case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all motions filed in member cases on January 20, 2020, but to leave to leave the motion filed on the main docket (14-MD-2543, ECF No. 7683) active. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/4/2020 Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/21/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ama)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment Motion for Certification Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) and Entry of Final Judgment Under FRCP 58. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Emison, Brett)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (6 in 1:20-cv-00094-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11898-JMF, 7678 in 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 7 in 1:19-cv-11900-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00104-JMF, 4 in 1:19-cv-11922-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00096-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00092-JMF, 6 in 1:20-cv-00101-JMF) Letter filed by General Motors LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this in the cases listed in Exhibit 1, but is directed not to close those cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/16/2020) (ama)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew B. Bloomer, P.C. dated January 15, 2020 re: Dismissal of Economic Loss Claims in Newly Consolidated Cases Pursuant to Order No. 50. Document filed by General Motors LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on January 2, 2020. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/2/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-11922-JMF(yv)
January 2, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (yv)
January 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 2, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 2, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 14md2543. (pc)
January 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeremy C. Shafer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jeremy C. Shafer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement;. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeremy C. Shafer to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
January 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremy C. Shafer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18388491)Document filed by Jennifer C. Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Related Case Statement)(Shafer, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer C. Dukes
Represented By: Jeremy C. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?