Hammoud v. Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban
Plaintiff: Jamal Hammoud
Defendant: Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban
Case Number: 1:2020cv00106
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file a Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion must be filed on or before March 15, 2020. Plaintiff's Opposition will then be due on April 15, 2020, and Defendant's Reply on April 30, 2020. SO ORDERED., (Motions due by 3/15/2020., Responses due by 4/15/2020, Replies due by 4/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/12/20) (yv)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Robert A. Giacovas dated February 7, 2020 re: Cover Letter for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Jamal Hammoud. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's letter response to Defendant's Jan. 31 Pre-Motion Letter).(Englander, Jacob)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Ari Englander on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Englander, Jacob)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Anthony Giacovas on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Giacovas, Robert)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael J. Sullivan dated January 31, 2020 re: Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban..(Sullivan, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance)
January 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JT)
January 15, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(West, Kimberly)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sullivan, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. By January 31, 2020, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban answer due 1/31/2020 (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/10/2020) (cf)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Notice of Removal, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Terrance P. Flynn dated 01/09/2020. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb).
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Flynn, Terrance)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 657264/2019..Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #3 Rule 81 Index, #4 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance)
January 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear; exhibits should not be filed in the same PDF as the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document No.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
January 7, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 7, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 657264/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18433552).Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #3 Local Rule 81 Index, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance) Modified on 1/7/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammoud v. Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Kimberly P. West
Represented By: Michael Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Hammoud
Represented By: Jacob Ari Englander
Represented By: Robert Anthony Giacovas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?