Bermo Guncay v. DHS et al
Plaintiff: Ana Lucia Bermo Guncay
Defendant: Town of East Hampton, East Hampton Village Police Department, S. christian, Acting Secretary KEVIN K MCALEENAN, Dpt of Homeland Sec. DHS, Julio Mario galeano, ICE/DHS and Sergeant jeffrey erickson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1514
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 3/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp)
January 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
January 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (gp)
January 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Manuel D. Gomez to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; pleading is titled for the Eastern District of New York. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 1/13/2020. (pne)
January 7, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #1 COMPLAINT TITLED FOR EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bermo Guncay v. DHS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of East Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Hampton Village Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dpt of Homeland Sec. DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Mario galeano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE/DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant jeffrey erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Lucia Bermo Guncay
Represented By: Manuel D. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?