Federman v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Federman
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Roger N. Farah, Hafzie Gaye Erkan, Abby F. Kohnstamm, Tiffany & Co., Alessandro Bogliolo, Robert S. Singer, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer and Annie Young-Scrivner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00159
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(i), plaintiff Samantha Federman ("Plaintiff') voluntarily dismisses the claims in the captioned action (the "Action") with prejudice. Because this notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiffs dismissal of the Action is effective upon the filing of this notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/13/2020) (gr)
February 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafzie Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. Document filed by Samantha Federman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Acocelli, Richard)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Richard C. Pepperman, II on January 28, 2020. Service was made by email. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2020) (gr)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 22, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-11926-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Annie Young-Scrivner waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert S. Singer waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William A. Shutzer waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. James E. Lillie waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Abby F. Kohnstamm waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jane Hertzmark Hudis waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hafzie Gaye Erkan waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rose Marie Bravo waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alessandro Bogliolo waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Roger N. Farah waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Tiffany & Co. waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Document filed by Samantha Federman. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 19-cv-11926. (jgo)
January 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-11926. Document filed by Samantha Federman.(Acocelli, Richard)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Acocelli, Richard)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafzie Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18450544)Document filed by Samantha Federman.(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federman v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hertzmark Hudis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N. Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafzie Gaye Erkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby F. Kohnstamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Bogliolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Shutzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Young-Scrivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Federman
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?