Daka v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Daka
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo, Roger N. Farah, James E. Lillie, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, Tiffany & Co., Hafize Gaye Erkan, Alessandro Bogliolo, Robert S. Singer, William A. Shutzer and Annie Young-Scrivner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses the above-titled action. This notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/13/2020) (gr)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafize Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. Document filed by Nicholas Daka. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.(Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2020) (gr)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 22, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-00159-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 20cv159. (pc)
January 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-00159. Document filed by Nicholas Daka.(Monteverde, Juan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alessandro Bogliolo, Rose Marie Bravo, Hafize Gaye Erkan, Roger N. Farah, Jane Hertzmark Hudis, Abby F. Kohnstamm, James E. Lillie, William A. Shutzer, Robert S. Singer, Tiffany & Co., Annie Young-Scrivner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18453377)Document filed by Nicholas Daka.(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daka v. Tiffany & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger N. Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Lillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hertzmark Hudis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby F. Kohnstamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hafize Gaye Erkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessandro Bogliolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Shutzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Young-Scrivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Daka
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?