Phillips v. Fashion Institute of Technology et al
Plaintiff: Marjorie Phillips
Defendant: Marilyn Barton, Fashion Institute of Technology and Mary Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00221
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Dranoff on behalf of Mary Davis..(Dranoff, Eric)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter, filed by Fashion Institute of Technology. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Marilyn Barton answer due 3/19/2020; Mary Davis answer due 3/19/2020; Fashion Institute of Technology answer due 3/19/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) (jwh)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from David A. Tauster, Esq. dated Feb. 14, 2020 re: Request by Fashion Institute of Technology for an Extension of Time for all Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Adam Tauster on behalf of Fashion Institute of Technology..(Tauster, David)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fashion Institute of Technology..(Gegwich, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Garth Gegwich on behalf of Fashion Institute of Technology..(Gegwich, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Marilyn Barton served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by Bafemi Silver, Senior Legal Assistant. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips..(Charles, Midwin)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mary Davis served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by Bafemi Silver, Senior Legal Assistant. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips..(Charles, Midwin)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Fashion Institute of Technology served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service was accepted by Bafemi Silver, Senior Legal Assistant. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips..(Charles, Midwin)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marilyn Barton, Mary Davis, Fashion Institute of Technology. (pc)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fashion Institute of Technology, Mary Davis, Marilyn Barton, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips. (Charles, Midwin)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips.(Charles, Midwin)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Midwin Charles to RE-FILE Document #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. THE PDF IS NOT SIGNED (lb)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Marilyn Barton, Mary Davis, Fashion Institute of Technology. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips.(Charles, Midwin)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Charles, Midwin)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/10/2020) (jwh)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Midwin Charles. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Midwin Charles to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Midwin Charles. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marjorie Phillips, Fashion Institute of Technology, Mary Davis, Marilyn Barton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Marjorie Phillips.(Charles, Midwin)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against The Fashion Institute of Technology. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18467548)Document filed by Marjorie Phillips.(Charles, Midwin) Modified on 1/10/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Fashion Institute of Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Institute of Technology
Represented By: David Adam Tauster
Represented By: Christopher Garth Gegwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Davis
Represented By: Eric Dranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Phillips
Represented By: Midwin Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?