Webster Bank, National Association v. American Finished Products Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Webster Bank, National Association
Defendant: American Finished Products Inc., Domenick Merlino and All American Extrusion Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00405
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by All American Extrusion Inc., American Finished Products Inc...(Giusti, Robert)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. If any defendant has not appeared by counsel plaintiff's counsel must forthwith send a copy of this notice to any unrepresented party. Date and place of conference : April 9, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/03/2020) (ama)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Domenick Merlino..(Giusti, Robert)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #9 Letter filed by Webster Bank, National Association. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., All American Extrusion Inc. answer due 3/13/2020; American Finished Products Inc. answer due 3/13/2020; Domenick Merlino answer due 3/13/2020. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/24/2020) (ama)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All American Extrusion Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020; American Finished Products Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020; Domenick Merlino served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. Service was accepted by Domenick Merlino. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association..(Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Teresa Sadutto-Carley, Esq. dated 02/14/2020 re: Letter Request for Extension. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association..(Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Giusti on behalf of Domenick Merlino..(Giusti, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to All American Extrusion Inc., American Finished Products Inc., Domenick Merlino. (dnh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Finished Products Inc. d/b/a International Extrusion Designs, All American Extrusion Inc. and Domenick Merlino, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
January 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Teresa Sadutto-Carley to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; attorney information omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Finished Products Inc. d/b/a International Extrusion Designs, All American Extrusion Inc. and Domenick Merlino, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa) Modified on 1/17/2020 (dnh).
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All American Extrusion Inc., American Finished Products Inc., Domenick Merlino. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Note, #2 Exhibit B-Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-AFP UCC, #4 Exhibit D-Commitment Letter, #5 Exhibit E-Modification Agreement, #6 Exhibit F-AAE UCC, #7 Exhibit G-Default Letter to Defendants)(Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
January 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Teresa Sadutto-Carley to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the party/parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 16, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 16, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Teresa Sadutto-Carley. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Webster Financial Corporation for Webster Bank, National Association. Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association.(Sadutto-Carley, Teresa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18513554)Document filed by Webster Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit AFP UCC, #4 Exhibit Commitment Letter, #5 Exhibit Modification Agreement, #6 Exhibit AAE UCC, #7 Exhibit Default Letter to the Defendants)(Sadutto-Carley, Teresa) Modified on 1/16/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster Bank, National Association v. American Finished Products Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Finished Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domenick Merlino
Represented By: Robert Giusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Extrusion Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webster Bank, National Association
Represented By: Teresa Sadutto-Carley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?