Ebanks v. iFinex Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Ebanks
Defendant: Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Holdings Limited, iFinex Inc., Tether Limited, BFXNA Inc., Philip Potter, Tether Operations Limited, DigFinex Inc. and Jean-Louis van der Velde
Case Number: 1:2020cv00453
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Hearing held on 2/27/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: For the reasons set forth on the record, the Leibowitz Plaintiffs' motion to appoint Lead Counsel is GRANTED, and the Young and Faubus Plaintiffs' motions are denied. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
February 24, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
February 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Oral Argument held on 2/24/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: Attorneys Kyle William Roche, Todd Michael Schneider, Matthew Sinclair Weiler, Caitlin Joan Halligan and Joseph Michael Delich representing the Leibowitz Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Karen M. Lerner, John D. Ridce, David E. Kovel and Anthony Epifanio Maneiro representing the Young Plaintiffs present. Attorney Gregory Bradley Link representing Plaintiff Faubus present. Attorneys Brian E. Cochran and Samuel Howard Rudman representing Plaintiff Ebanks present. Attorneys Jim Walden, Veronica Wayner and Daniel Chirlin representing iFinex Defendants present. The Court defers ruling on motions at this time. The next conference, to be held telephonically, is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 4:00 p.m. At the appointed time, the parties are directed to call the conference system at (888) 363-4749, and enter access code 6624801. Please note that the conference line will not be available until the scheduled time (4:00 p.m.). (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for oral argument concerning the pending motions to appoint interim lead class counsel on February 24, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 2/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (jca)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (82) Motion for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 82 of Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., 19 Civ. 9236 (KPF). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (rro)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re: (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(Kovel, David)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: On January 17, 2020, the Court ordered that all counsel seeking to be heard regarding the appointment of lead interim counsel to file their papers on or before January 27, 2020. The Court recognizes that certain counsel had filed motions to be appointed lead interim counsel prior to January 27, 2020, giving other counsel the opportunity to file opposition papers to those pending motions on January 27, 2020. In the interest of allowing interested counsel an equal opportunity to oppose motions to be appointed lead interim counsel, the Court will permit counsel to file papers opposing lead interim counsel motions that were filed on January 27, 2020. Such opposition papers shall be filed on or before February 7, 2020. ( Responses due by 2/7/2020) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/28/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(mro)
January 28, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Plaintiff Bryan Faubus's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Linkh, Gregory)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Lerner, Karen)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen M. Lerner on behalf of David Crystal, Eric Young, Adam Kurtz. (Lerner, Karen)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting (61) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-cv-09236-KPF; granting (27) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00169-KPF. The Court is in receipt of the parties' January 16, 2020 joint motion in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236, Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211, seeking to consolidate the matters. The Court is also in receipt of a letter dated January 24, 2020, filed in Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453, requesting that the Court consolidate that matter with Leibowitz, Young, and Faubus as well. The parties' motions are GRANTED. The following actions are hereby consolidated: a. Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236; b. Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169; c. Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211; d. Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (mro)
January 27, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. (mro)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Samuel H. Rudman dated January 24, 2020 re: Consolidation. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
January 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
January 21, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 21, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by Joseph Ebanks. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a letter, not to exceed five pages in length, stating his position regarding whether this case should be consolidated with Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236, Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, and Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. Civ. 211, on or before January 24, 2020. If Plaintiff's counsel intends to file papers regarding the appointment of interim class counsel, it may file its motion on or before January 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/17/2020) (jca)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Samuel H. Rudman dated January 17, 2020 re: Consolidation and Motions for Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BFXNA Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Philip Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Jean-Louis van der Velde. (pne)
January 17, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 19CV9236. (pne)
January 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to iFinex Inc., BFXNA Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, DigFinex Inc., Jean-Louis van der Velde, Giancarlo Devasini, Philip Potter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks. (Rudman, Samuel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rudman, Samuel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BFXNA Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Philip Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18525986)Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebanks v. iFinex Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giancarlo Devasini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iFinex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFXNA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tether Operations Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DigFinex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Louis van der Velde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ebanks
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?