Kesner v. Baker Botts, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Harvey J. Kesner
Defendant: Baker Botts, Jonathan A. Shapiro and Baker Botts, LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00551
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Baker Botts, LLP..(Quigley, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jonathan A. Shapiro in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Alternatively, to Transfer to the Southern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404.. Document filed by Baker Botts, LLP, Jonathan A. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Shapiro Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Shapiro Declaration).(Quigley, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Alternatively, to Transfer to the Southern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. . Document filed by Baker Botts, LLP, Jonathan A. Shapiro..(Quigley, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to State a Claim, and Alternatively, to Transfer to the Southern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Document filed by Baker Botts, LLP, Jonathan A. Shapiro..(Quigley, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Paul R. Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The request of Applicant Paul R. Elliott for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. If this action is assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/12/20) (yv)
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Paul Reichert Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19081972. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Paul Reichert Elliott to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19081972. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Baker Botts, LLP, Jonathan A. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Elliott, Paul)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Robert C. Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Robert Buschel, Esq., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/27/20) (yv)
February 26, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Robert C. Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Robert C. Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Buschel, Robert)
February 10, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Robert C. Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18748995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert C. Buschel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18748995. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Appendix Certificate of good standing Florida, #4 Appendix Certificate of good standing California).(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 2/10/2020 (wb).
January 31, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan A. Shapiro waiver sent on 1/25/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner. (Buschel, Robert)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Baker Botts, LLP waiver sent on 1/25/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner. (Buschel, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Baker Botts, LLP, Jonathan A. Shapiro. Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner.(Buschel, Robert)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert C. Buschel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Harvey J. Kesner, Jonathan A. Shapiro, Baker Botts, LLP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert C. Buschel. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1961; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 18:1962; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
January 22, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert C. Buschel to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 22, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 22, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 22, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Buschel, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Harvey J. Kesner. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18560382)Document filed by Harvey J. Kesner.(Buschel, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesner v. Baker Botts, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Botts, LLP
Represented By: Paul R. Elliott
Represented By: Brendan Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey J. Kesner
Represented By: Robert C. Buschel
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?