U.G. et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: U.G., an infant, by his mother and natrual guardian, ASSETA NANEEMA and Asseta Naneema
Defendant: Sandy Lau Bui and New York Presbyterian Hospital
Case Number: 1:2020cv00613
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 22:2702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION AND VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between parties and their counsel, that: Plaintiffs hereby substitute the United States of America as the defendant in place of Sandy Lau Bui, D.O.; Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses all claims against the United States of America in the above-captioned action, without prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees; Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses all claims against defendant New York & Presbyterian Hospital without prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees; as further set forth in this Order. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added. Sandy Lau Bui, D.O and New York Presbyterian Hospital terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/13/2020) (cf)
February 13, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #10 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety; stipulation and substitution of party. (km)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Sandy Lau Bui, D.O. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Issacharoff, Lucas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Theresa Grottalio on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Grottalio, Karen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alejandra Rosa Gil on behalf of New York Presbyterian Hospital..(Gil, Alejandra)
January 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 2/21/2020. (mro)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Letter Motion to Stay. DENIED. It is ORDERED that the Government shall file any motion to substitute by February 21, 2020. The Court will address the time to file any motion to dismiss after ruling on the motion to substitute. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/30/2020) (mro)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 12:20 PM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/30/2020) (mro)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/30/2020) (mro)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Lucas Issacharoff dated 1/24/2020. Document filed by Sandy Lau Bui, D.O.(Issacharoff, Lucas)
January 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lucas Estlund Issacharoff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.G., Asseta Naneema. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text was entered incorrectly as part of party name. (pne)
January 24, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 24, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 24, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Issacharoff, Lucas)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on U.G., Asseta Naneema, New York Presbyterian Hospital on 1/23/2020. Service was made by Mail and Electronic Mail. Document filed by Sandy Lau Bui. (Issacharoff, Lucas)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 30546/2019E..Document filed by Sandy Lau Bui. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certification Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 233(c))(Issacharoff, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.G. et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.G., an infant, by his mother and natrual guardian, ASSETA NANEEMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asseta Naneema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Lau Bui
Represented By: Lucas Estlund Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Presbyterian Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?