Benitez v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Olga Benitez
Defendant: Ronald L Parker, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00732
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on MARCH 9. 2020. Service was accepted by GAIL ALLEN. Document filed by Olga Benitez..(Lesch, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE on MARCH 6, 2020. Service was accepted by BIRGET HARRINGTON. Document filed by Olga Benitez..(Lesch, David)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/3/2020) (va)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald L Parker, United States Of America, United States Postal Service. (pne)
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Solomon Isadore Lesch to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney ( Solomon Isadore Lesch). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne)
January 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
January 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne)
January 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Solomon Isadore Lesch to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
January 27, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Ronald L Parker added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Olga Benitez. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Lesch, Solomon)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lesch, Solomon) Modified on 1/28/2020 (pne).
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Postal Service, United States of America, Ronald L. Parker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Olga Benitez. (Lesch, Solomon)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Postal Service. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18609676)Document filed by Olga Benitez.(Lesch, Solomon) Modified on 1/28/2020 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benitez v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Benitez
Represented By: Solomon Isadore Lesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?