Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. v. Societe Generale, S.A.
Plaintiff: Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.
Defendant: The National Bank of Canada, The Bank of Nova Scotia, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria S.A. and Societe Generale S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00851
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Florida Southern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-22842. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
February 4, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
February 4, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
February 4, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions..(sjo)
February 4, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sjo)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #16 Amended Complaint, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Societe Generale, S.A.. (Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Societe Generale, S.A. may file a twenty-page Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Its Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Societe Generale, S.A.. Attorney Jose I. Astigarraga added to party Societe Generale, S.A.(pty:dft). (Astigarraga, Jose) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Stroman, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #16 Amended Complaint, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Antonio Robinson on behalf of Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Robinson, Dwayne) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to The National Bank of Canada. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., The Bank of Nova Scotia. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Set Deadlines per DE 32 Order as to #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Plaintiff to respond to SocGen's Motion to Dismiss is extended up to and through December 13, 2019. SocGen shall have until January 10, 2020, to file a reply in further support of its Motion to Dismiss. The deadlines in this Order supersede those initially described by the Court's July 31, 2018 Order 8 . Plaintiff shall have up to forty pages for its opposition to SocGen's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #16 Amended Complaint, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Moncada, Stephanie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying without prejudice #18 Motion for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #16 Amended Complaint, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Societe Generale, S.A.. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Dominique Bourrinet)(Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Societe Generale, S.A. identifying Other Affiliate SG Americas Inc. for Societe Generale, S.A. (Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Javier Asis Lopez on behalf of Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Societe Generale, S.A. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended up to and through October 29, 2019. Societe Generale, S.A. is authorized to file a motion to dismiss on October 29, 2019, without the joinder of its co-defendants. The position of the other Defendants (and the timing of any response they may have to the Amended Complaint) will be addressed once they are served. The response, reply, and page limitations granted by this Court in prior orders 8 14 shall apply to the motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint to be filed by Societe Generale, S.A. No rights or defenses of Societe Generale, S.A., including but not limited to defenses based on lack of personal jurisdiction (other than as to service), areprejudiced or waived by this Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 26 Order: Societe Generale, S.A. response due 10/29/2019. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Societe Generale, S.A. re #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Herrera, Sujey) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (kpe). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Amended Complaint, by Societe Generale, S.A.. (Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Societe Generale, S.A. re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Societe Generale, S.A. (Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Amended Complaint, by Societe Generale, S.A.. Attorney Sujey Scarlett Herrera added to party Societe Generale, S.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrera, Sujey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., The Bank of Nova Scotia, The National Bank of Canada. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Parties are not Defendants. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Approval of Plan for Alternative Service of Process by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul A. Sack on behalf of Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. Attorney Paul A. Sack added to party Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.(pty:pla). (Sack, Paul) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a motion to dismiss that is up to forty pages. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Societe Generale, S.A.. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Societe Generale, S.A.(pty:dft). (Mullins, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Steven Wolowitz is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Wolowitz at SWolowitz@mayerbrown.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Alex Lakatos is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. ALakatos@mayerbrown.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Wolowitz. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11875124 by Societe Generale, S.A.. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echarte Morales, Gretel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alex C. Lakatos. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11875024 by Societe Generale, S.A.. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Echarte Morales, Gretel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A), the time for the Defendant, Societe Generale, S.A., to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint will be extended to 60 days from the date of this Order; if Defendant moves to dismiss, Plaintiff will have 30 days to respond, and Defendant will then have 21 days to file a reply in further support of the motion. Defendant accepts service of process. No rights or defenses of the Defendant, including but not limited to defenses based on lack of personal jurisdiction (other than as to service), are prejudiced or waived.by this Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Societe Generale, S.A.. Attorney Gretel Echarte Morales added to party Societe Generale, S.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Echarte Morales, Gretel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.. Societe Generale, S.A. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Stroman, Evan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Societe Generale, S.A.. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. re #1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,, filed by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against Societe Generale, S.A., d/b/a Societe Generale Americas. Filing fees $ 6948.00 receipt number 113C-11801033. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 400.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,548.00 for this Action, filed by Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galves, Inc. d/b/a Banco Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez, Javier) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 2/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc. v. Societe Generale, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sucesores de Don Carlos Nunez y Dona Pura Galvez, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Stephanie Moncada
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Paul A. Sack
Represented By: Javier Asis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Bank of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Nova Scotia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale S.A.
Represented By: Gretel Echarte Morales
Represented By: Jose I. Astigarraga
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?