Aspen America Insurance Company v. Barry et al
Plaintiff: Aspen America Insurance Company
Defendant: Winebow Inc., Winebow Imports Inc. and Robert Barry
Case Number: 1:2020cv00854
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Winebow Inc...(dnh)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Winebow Imports Inc...(dnh)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Barry..(dnh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Winebow Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company..(Kallmann, Stanley)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Winebow Imports Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company..(Kallmann, Stanley)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Barry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company..(Kallmann, Stanley)
February 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Stanley Walter Kallmann to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; remove the name listed in the clerk field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Winebow Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company.(Kallmann, Stanley) Modified on 2/20/2020 (sj).
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Winebow Imports Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company.(Kallmann, Stanley) Modified on 2/20/2020 (sj).
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Barry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company.(Kallmann, Stanley) Modified on 2/20/2020 (sj).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/10/2020) (rro)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kallmann, Stanley)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kallmann, Stanley)
February 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stanley Walter Kallmann. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332;. (jgo)
February 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Stanley Walter Kallmann. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
February 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Stanley Walter Kallmann. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aspen America Insurance Company; Robert Barry. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
February 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Barry, Winebow Imports Inc., Winebow Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18649866)Document filed by Aspen America Insurance Company..(Kallmann, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen America Insurance Company v. Barry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winebow Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winebow Imports Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen America Insurance Company
Represented By: Stanley Walter Kallmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?