Ironshore Indemnity Inc. v. wong et al
Plaintiff: Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran and Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Defendant: Sylvia wong, Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc. and Di Martini Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00978
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pd
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc. answer due 4/8/2020. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/17/2020) (jca)
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Corey Morgenstern, Esq. dated March 16, 2020. Document filed by Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc...(Morgenstern, Corey)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corey Morgenstern on behalf of Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc...(Morgenstern, Corey)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Gibbons on behalf of Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc...(Gibbons, Brian)
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sylvia wong..(Kane, Courtney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Sylvia wong served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service was accepted by Joe Carpenter. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc...(Phelan, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Di Martini Inc. served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty Authorized Person inthe Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc...(Phelan, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc. served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty Authorized Person inthe Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc...(Phelan, Robert)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Sylvia wong answer due 3/6/2020.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/3/2020) (rro)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Courtney F. Kane dated March 2, 2020. Document filed by Sylvia wong..(Kane, Courtney)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Di Martini Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement).(Kane, Courtney)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sylvia wong..(jgo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc...(jgo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Di Martini Inc...(jgo)
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert William Phelan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ironshore Indemnity Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert William Phelan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $540000000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $544000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Other Affiliate Ironshore Insurance Ltd., Other Affiliate Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ironshore Europe Ltd for Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran..(Phelan, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Regency Heating & AirConditoning Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran..(Phelan, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Di Martini Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran..(Phelan, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sylvia Wong, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran..(Phelan, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Phelan, Robert)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Di Martini Inc., Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc., Sylvia wong. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18698644)Document filed by Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran..(Phelan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ironshore Indemnity Inc. v. wong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia wong
Represented By: Courtney Frances Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Heating & AirConditioning, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Gibbons
Represented By: Corey Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Di Martini Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Frances Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Indemnity Inc. as subrogee of Emile Mimran
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?