Clifford v. Major League Baseball et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Clifford
Defendant: Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball, Houston Astros, LLC and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2020cv01000
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marisa Antos-Fallon on behalf of Houston Astros, LLC, Houston Astros, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR.(Antos-Fallon, Marisa)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:20-cv-01000-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss ., (30 in 1:20-cv-00632-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P., Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR.(Moskowitz, Lauren)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:20-cv-01000-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss ., (36 in 1:20-cv-00632-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Houston Astros, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR.(Preston, Hilary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (27 in 1:20-cv-00632-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss ., (6 in 1:20-cv-01000-JSR) MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR.(Hardiman, John)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR (jwh)
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Oral Argument set for 3/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Houston Astros, LLC..(Preston, Hilary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Houston Astros, LLC..(Preston, Hilary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Lauren A. Moskowitz in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4).(Moskowitz, Lauren)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P...(Moskowitz, Lauren)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P...(Moskowitz, Lauren)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of John L. Hardiman in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10).(Hardiman, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball..(Hardiman, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball..(Hardiman, John)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Clifford v. Major League Baseball et al (20-cv-1000) ("Clifford") was transferred to this court as a related case to Olson v. Maj or League Baseball et al (20-cv-632) ("Olson") on February 12, 2020. The two cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes and the case management plan previously ordered in Olson will also govern Clifford. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00632-JSR, 1:20-cv-01000-JSR (ks)
February 18, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-00632-JSR.. (ks)
February 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (wb)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
February 12, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-00632-JSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-00632. Document filed by Christopher Clifford..(Radice, John)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P., Houston Astros, LLC, John Does 1-50, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball. Document filed by Christopher Clifford..(Radice, John)
February 6, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P., Houston Astros, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball, John Does 1-50 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Christopher Clifford. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Radice, John)
February 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
February 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John D. Radice. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
February 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John D. Radice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the All Defendant radio button was selected; Add John Does 1-50 to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Radice, John)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18700661)Document filed by Christopher Clifford..(Radice, John) Modified on 2/6/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford v. Major League Baseball et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Clifford
Represented By: John D. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Red Sox Baseball Club L.P.
Represented By: Lauren Ann Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLB Advanced Media, L.P.
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major League Baseball
Represented By: John Louis Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Astros, LLC
Represented By: Hilary Lovett Preston
Represented By: Marisa Antos-Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?